EP1953436 - Valve seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Millipore AB Englundavägen 7 171 41 Solna / SE | [2012/45] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Millipore AB Rödjans väg 7 449 34 Nödinge / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Myhrberg, Lennart Ivar Arosenius väg 29 446 33 Älvängen / SE | 02 /
Samuelsson, Håkan Stigen 29 439 92 Onsala / SE | 03 /
Wejrot, Bertil Per Ekströms väg 5 433 34 Partille / SE | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Östergren, Markus, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2012/45] |
Former [2008/52] | Östergren, Markus, et al AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Andersson, Inga-Lill Awapatent AB Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 08150093.6 | 08.01.2008 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | SE20070000265 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: SE 0700265 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1953436 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1953436 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1953436 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16K41/10, F16K41/12 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
F16K7/16 (EP,SE,US);
F16K7/12 (SE,US);
F16K1/42 (US);
F16K41/103 (EP,US);
F16K41/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | Ventildichtung | [2008/32] | English: | Valve seal | [2008/32] | French: | Joint de vanne | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2008 | AT | 07.11.2012 | CY | 07.11.2012 | CZ | 07.11.2012 | DK | 07.11.2012 | EE | 07.11.2012 | FI | 07.11.2012 | HR | 07.11.2012 | LT | 07.11.2012 | LV | 07.11.2012 | MT | 07.11.2012 | PL | 07.11.2012 | RO | 07.11.2012 | SE | 07.11.2012 | SI | 07.11.2012 | SK | 07.11.2012 | TR | 07.11.2012 | IE | 08.01.2013 | LU | 08.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 07.02.2013 | NO | 07.02.2013 | GR | 08.02.2013 | IS | 07.03.2013 | PT | 07.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MT | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IE | 08.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MT | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
IE | 08.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
IE | 08.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
NO | 07.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29919298U (TUCHENHAGEN GMBH [DE]); | [X]WO0075541 (TUCHENHAGEN GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]US2002113223 (NEWBERG DOUGLAS A [US]) |