EP1956461 - Local controller, remote management controller and method for automatically updating the local controller of an air conditioner system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Jin-Seok 327-23, Gasan-Dong, Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Youn, Sang-Chul 327-23, Gasan-Dong, Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jeon, Duck-Gu 327-23, Gasan-Dong, Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08150651.1 | 25.01.2008 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | KR20070013379 | 08.02.2007 Original published format: KR 20070013379 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1956461 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1956461 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, F24F11/00 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
H04L12/2834 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/56 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/49 (KR);
F24F11/54 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2012/285 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/33] | G05D23/19 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/29] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lokales Steuergerät, Fernverwaltungssteuergerät und Verfahren zur automatischen Aktualisierung des lokalen Steuergerätes eines Klimaanlagensystems | [2008/33] | English: | Local controller, remote management controller and method for automatically updating the local controller of an air conditioner system | [2008/33] | French: | Contrôleur local, contrôleur de gestion distante et procédé pour la mise à jour automatique du contrôleur local d'un système de climatisation d'air | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 04.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.02.2013 | 07.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/28] | 03.03.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5682949 (RATCLIFFE EDWARD L [CA], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 10-35; figures 1,6 * * column 5, line 58 - column 14, line 13 * [I] 3; | [XI]US2004183722 (UEDA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0024] , [0029] , [0033] - [0037]; figures 1,4,6 * [I] 3,8; | [A]US2005080879 (KIM CHANG HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8* paragraphs [0044] , [0051] , [0058] , [0060] , [0064] - [0066] * |