EP2085222 - Printing unit, folding unit or rotating print machine with components layered on slides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIFAG Maschinenfabrik AG Wylerringstrasse 39 3014 Bern / CH | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seiler, Thomas Langestrasse 34G 3603 Thun / CH | 02 /
Fröhlich, Martin Feldrainstrasse 16 3098 Köniz / CH | 03 /
Burri, Daniel Buchwaldstrasse 1 3510 Konolfingen / CH | 04 /
Zehnder, Thomas Rollisweg 27 3177 Laupen / CH | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08150851.7 | 30.01.2008 | [2009/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085222 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/30, B41F13/54, B41F13/56, B41F13/58, B41F13/60, B41F13/62, B65H45/16 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
B41F13/30 (EP);
B41F13/54 (EP);
B41F13/56 (EP);
B41F13/58 (EP);
B41F13/60 (EP);
B41F13/62 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | Druckeinheit, Falzapparat oder Rotationsdruckmaschine mit mittels Schlitten gelagerten Komponenten | [2009/36] | English: | Printing unit, folding unit or rotating print machine with components layered on slides | [2009/32] | French: | Unité d'impression, appareil de pliage ou machine d'impression rotative ayant des composants agencés à l'aide de chariots | [2009/32] |
Former [2009/32] | Druckeinheit, Falzapparat oder Rotationsdruckmaschine mit Mittels Schlitten gelagerten Komponenten | Examination procedure | 05.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/07] | 08.10.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19937796 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-16,19 * column 1, line 58 - column 7, line 14 * [Y] 7,14,20; | [XY]EP1075945 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-13,15,16,19 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0024] * [Y] 7,14,20; | [XY]DE19534651 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-13,15,16,19 * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 52 * [Y] 7,14,20; | [XD]DE19937806 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [XD] 1-6,10-13,15,16,19 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 29 *; | [Y]DE7129767U (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE494413 (JULIUS FISCHER FA) [Y] 14 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2005056195 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH], et al) [YD] 20 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1068728 (STRACHAN&HENSHAW LIMITED, BRISTOL) [X] 9-22 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [X]CH239019 (BEWEG AG WERKSTAETTE FUER DAS [CH]) [X] 9-22 * page 3, line 40 - page 3, line 92 * | by applicant | DE102004063944 | DE19937806 | WO2005056195 |