EP1958933 - Process for purifying L-cysteine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhm, Andreas / Am Moosfeld 64a 81829, München / DE | [2011/44] |
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
Böhm, Andreas Am Moosfeld 64a 81829, München / DE | Representative(s) | Potten, Holger, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Potten, Holger, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08150940.8 | 01.02.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | DE20071007333 | 14.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007007333 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958933 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958933 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C319/28, C07C323/58, C12P13/12 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
C07C319/28 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/28, C07C323/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von L-Cystein | [2008/34] | English: | Process for purifying L-cysteine | [2008/34] | French: | Procédé destiné au nettoyage de L-cystéine | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2008 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | IE | 02.11.2011 | IT | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | LU | 01.02.2012 | BG | 02.02.2012 | GB | 02.02.2012 | NO | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GB | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GB | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GB | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GB | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GB | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GB | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0250987 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [DA] 1-9* claim 1 *; | [DX]EP1571223 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [DX] 1-9 * page 6, lines 4-42 * * page 9, lines 24-27 * | by applicant | EP0250987 | EP0858510 | DE10040176 | EP1059288 | EP1234874 | EP1220940 | EP0885962 | EP1571223 | US2005221453 | EP1298200 | EP1645623 | EP1650296 | - HOLLEMANN-WIBERG, LEHRBUCH DER ANORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, (1985), vol. 91.-100, pages 485 - 523 |