EP2085370 - Setting and hardening accelerator for hydraulic binders in the solid state [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallegos, Pedro Tte. Luis Uribe 121 Sindempart, Coquimbo / CL | 02 /
Arancibia, Lili Santa Julia 550 Ñuñoa-Santiago / CL | 03 /
Olivares, Hugo Los Tulipanes 1931 Santiago / CL | 04 /
Lindlar, Benedikt Eichbühlstrasse 35 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2018/37] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
Gallegos, Pedro Av Apoquindo 6936 Las Condes-Santiago / CL | ||
02 /
Arancibia, Lili Santa Julia 550 Ñuñoa-Santiago / CL | |||
03 /
Olivares, Hugo Las Azucenas 1991 Santiago Centro / CL | |||
04 /
Lindlar, Benedikt Eichbühlstrasse 35 78467 Konstanz / DE | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2009/32] | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 08151026.5 | 04.02.2008 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085370 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2085370 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C04B40/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
C04B40/0039 (EP);
C04B2103/12 (EP);
C04B2103/14 (EP);
C04B2111/00163 (EP);
C04B2111/00172 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B40/0039, C04B14/042, C04B14/303, C04B22/062, C04B22/142, C04B22/148, C04B22/149, C04B24/04, C04B24/06, C04B24/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/37] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fester Erstarrungs- und Erhärtungsbeschleuniger für hydraulische Bindemittel | [2009/32] | English: | Setting and hardening accelerator for hydraulic binders in the solid state | [2009/32] | French: | Accélérateur solide de prise et de durcissement pour liants hydrauliques | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2008 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | IT | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | PL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | GB | 04.02.2019 | IE | 04.02.2019 | LU | 04.02.2019 | MT | 04.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
GB | 04.02.2019 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
GB | 04.02.2019 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
GB | 04.02.2019 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
GB | 04.02.2019 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 12.09.2018 | |
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0078688 (MBT HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 9-11 * claims *[A] 1-8; | [X]EP1167317 (SIKA AG [CH]) [X] 1-11 * page 3, paragraphs [0029] to [0036], page 4, paragraphs [0038] to [0040], claims *; | [XA]EP1422205 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [X] 9-11 * paragraphs [0010] to [0015], examples, claims * [A] 1-8 | by applicant | EP0946451 |