EP2088631 - Concentrating photovoltaic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arima EcoEnergy Technologies Corporation 2F, No. 349, Sec. 2, Renhe Road Dashi Town, Taoyuan 335 / TW | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sen-Tien 2F, No.349, Sec. 2, Renhe Road, Dashi Town 335, Taoyuan / TW | 02 /
Tzeng, Yen-Chang 2F, No.349, Sec. 2, Renhe Road, Dashi Town 335, Taoyuan / TW | 03 /
Chen, Chi-Yuan 2F, No.349, Sec. 2, Renhe Road, Dashi Town 335, Taoyuan / TW | 04 /
Cheng, Chung-Chieh 2F, No.349, Sec. 2, Renhe Road, Dashi Town 335, Taoyuan / TW | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55/Roßstr. 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08151124.8 | 06.02.2008 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2088631 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/052, H05K7/20, H05K5/04 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
H01L31/0543 (EP);
Y02E10/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, IT [2010/16] |
Former [2009/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Photovoltaische Konzentrierungsvorrichtung | [2009/33] | English: | Concentrating photovoltaic apparatus | [2009/33] | French: | Appareil photovoltaïque concentré | [2009/33] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/50] | 27.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6399874 (OLAH STEPHEN [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 2; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9847339 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; LOEOEW PER ROLAND [SE]; NYGREN LARS [SE]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 25 - page 3, line 29 * * page 5, line 23 - page 9, line 26 * * page 13, line 15 - page 14, line 18; figures 1-3,5A,5B *; | [A]US4029519 (SCHERTZ WILLIAM W ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]US2008000514 (LIN KUO-LEN [TW] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022]; figure 1 * |