EP2093979 - Multi-function slide mechanism for a mobile communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griffin, Jason 14 Deer Ridge Crescent Kitchener Ontario N2P 2L3 / CA | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2009/35] | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 08151627.0 | 19.02.2008 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093979 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04M1/23, H01R13/447, H01R13/52 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H04M1/0274 (EP);
H01R13/4534 (EP);
H04M1/236 (EP);
H01R24/62 (EP);
H04M1/0237 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Extension states | AL | 19.02.2008 | BA | 19.02.2008 | MK | 19.02.2008 | RS | 19.02.2008 | Title | German: | Multifunktioneller Gleitmechanismus für eine mobile Kommunikationsvorrichtung | [2009/35] | English: | Multi-function slide mechanism for a mobile communication device | [2009/35] | French: | Mécanisme coulissant multifonctions pour un dispositif de communications mobile | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 27.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9209163 (UNIVERSAL CELLULAR INC [US]) [X] 1,4 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 7 ** figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2004203515 (KURIYAMA KAZUNARI [JP]) [X] 1,7,12 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0068]; figures 16-19 *; | [X]US2004259590 (MIDDLETON DAVID DESMOND [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraph [0022] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1610420 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,7,9,11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * figure 3 *; | [X]US2008002376 (STOKHOLM DAN [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1-4G * | Examination | EP0590494 | WO2007029904 | by applicant | WO9209163 | US2004203515 | US2004259590 | EP1610420 | US2008002376 |