EP1983547 - X-ray source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PANalytical B.V. P.O. Box 13 7600 AA Almelo / NL | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filmer, Bart c/o PANalytical B.V. Lelyweg 1, 7602 EA PO Box 13 7600 AA, Almelo / NL | 02 /
Lambers, Maurice c/o PANalytical B.V. Lelyweg 1, 7602 EA PO Box 13 7600 AA, Almelo / NL | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2008/43] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08151763.3 | 21.02.2008 | [2008/43] | Priority number, date | EP20070106634 | 20.04.2007 Original published format: EP 07106634 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1983547 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1983547 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/06 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
H01J35/064 (EP,US);
H01J2235/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/27] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Röntgenquelle | [2008/43] | English: | X-ray source | [2008/43] | French: | Source de rayons X | [2008/43] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 23.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3312856 (LAFFERTY JAMES M, et al) [A] * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 13; figure 5 *; | [A]US2014787 (JAMES SMITHELLS COLIN, et al) [A] * page 1, column R, lines 43-53 * * page 2, column L, lines 6-20 *; | [A]JPH04368761 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] * abstract * * figure 6 *; | [A]US4730353 (ONO KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] * column 10, lines 32-47 *; | [A]US3273005 (LAFFERTY JAMES M) [A] * column 3, lines 26-75; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US1733813 (WESLEY MARDEN JOHN, et al) | by applicant | US3312856 | US2014787 | JPH04368761 |