EP1965052 - Mixer for cooling and sealing air system of turbomachinery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/31] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eluripati, Ravi Praveen S. 105 Jordan Crest Court Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 02 /
Ball, David Wesley Jr. 209 Fairfax Road Easley, SC 29642 / US | 03 /
Whaling, Kenneth Neil 310 Summerwalk Place Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 04 /
Zhang, Hua 211 Traymore Way Greer, SC 29650 / US | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08151879.7 | 25.02.2008 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | US20070711306 | 27.02.2007 Original published format: US 711306 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1965052 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1965052 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1965052 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, F02C6/08, F02C7/18, F01D25/12, F02C3/06, F02C3/32, F01D11/04 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
F02C7/185 (EP,US);
F01D11/04 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F02C3/06 (EP,US);
F02C3/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | F01D11/00, F02C6/08, F02C7/18 | ||
Former IPC [2008/36] | F02C6/08, F02C7/12, F01D11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/46] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mischer für das Kühlluft- und Sperrluftsystem einer Turbomaschine | [2008/36] | English: | Mixer for cooling and sealing air system of turbomachinery | [2008/36] | French: | Mélangeur pour le système d'air de refroidissement et d'étanchéité d'une turbomachine | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 10.09.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.10.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6202413 (BAKER GLENN L [US], et al) [X] 9 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 10; figures 1-4 * [Y] 1-8; | [Y]US6615574 (MARKS PAUL T [US]) [Y] 1-8* column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 24; figure 3 * |