EP1995303 - Enzyme preparation with endoglucanase activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schülein, Martin Deceased / DK | 02 /
Oxenboll, Karen Margrethe Slotsvej 76 2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 03 /
Andersen, Lene Nonboe Laksevej 11 3450 Alleroed / DK | 04 /
Lassen, Soren Flensted Gydebakken 3B 3520 Farum / DK | 05 /
Kauppinen, Markus Sakari Norskekrogen 12 2765 Smørum / DK | 06 /
Nielsen, Jack Bech 1 Bluxome Street, apt 408 San Fransisco, CA 94107 / US | [2008/48] | Application number, filing date | 08152515.6 | 06.10.1995 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | DK19940001160 | 06.10.1994 Original published format: DK 116094 | DK19940001296 | 11.11.1994 Original published format: DK 129694 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1995303 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1995303 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, C11D11/00, C12N9/42, C12N15/81 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
D21H17/005 (EP,US);
C11D3/38645 (EP,US);
C12N15/81 (EP,US);
C12N9/2437 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01004 (EP,US);
D06M16/003 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2008/48] | Title | German: | Ein Enzympräparat mit Enduglucanase-Aktivität | [2008/48] | English: | Enzyme preparation with endoglucanase activity | [2008/48] | French: | Préparation enzymatique présentant une activité endoglucanase | [2008/48] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 20.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95933337.8 / EP0788541 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950933337) is 17.05.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9117244 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [X] 5-11 * the whole document * [A] 1-4; | [XA]WO9117243 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [X] 5-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-4; | [X]WO9407998 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 5-15 * the whole document *; | [XA] - KANG MYOUNG-KYU ET AL, "Partial purification and some properties of carboxymethyl cellulases from alkalophilic Cephalosporium sp. RYM-202", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1993), Database accession no. PREV199497179563, XP002497911 [X] 5-15 * abstract * [A] 1-4 | [ ] - KOREAN JOURNAL OF MYCOLOGY, (1993), vol. 21, no. 4, ISSN 0253-651X, pages 301 - 309 |