EP1970067 - Pharmaceutical compound for treating acidaemia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medice Arzneimittel Pütter GmbH & Co. KG Kuhloweg 37 58638 Iserlohn / DE | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalisch, Peter Im Wannebachtal 4 58708 Menden / DE | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08152657.6 | 12.03.2008 | [2008/38] | Priority number, date | EP20070103925 | 12.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07103925 | [2008/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970067 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/00, A61K9/28, A61K9/30, A61K9/20 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
A61K9/1617 (EP);
A61K33/00 (EP);
A61K33/10 (EP);
A61K9/4858 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung einer Übersäuerung des Blutes | [2009/01] | English: | Pharmaceutical compound for treating acidaemia | [2008/38] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique destinée au traitement d'une hyperacidité du sang | [2008/38] |
Former [2008/38] | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung einer Übersäuerung des blutes | Examination procedure | 19.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2130087 (HELBIG DR JOACHIME; KOPP DR KLAUS FRIEDRICH) [X] 1-14 * claims 1,3,9,12-15,25,26 * * page 4, line 42 - page 5, line 8 * * page 5, line 45 - page 6, line 30 * * page 7, lines 29-39 *; | [X]GB2307408 (SANG WHANG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-3 * * page 14, lines 7-10 * * page 15, lines 2-9 *; | [X]EP0074426 (HELBIG JOACHIM DR MED VET [DE]; KOPP KLAUS F [DE]) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-15 * * page 20, lines 1-21 *; | [X]FR1272923 (PROFESSEUR JACK MASQUELIER) [X] 1-14 * claim 1 * * page 2, column 1, lines 4-7; figure 1; example 1 *; | [X]US4451454 (WONG DENNIS W [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 10, lines 1-12; claims 1,4,5 * * column 9, lines 45-49 * |