EP2103634 - Production of propylene-based polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-2101 / US | Representative(s) | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1830 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 08153128.7 | 20.03.2008 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103634 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/06, C08F4/6592 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
C08F10/06 (EP);
C08F110/06 (EP);
C08F210/06 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP);
Y02P20/54 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/06, C08F4/65927 (EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/20 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Herstellung propylen-basierter polymere | [2009/39] | English: | Production of propylene-based polymers | [2009/39] | French: | Production de polymères à base de propylène | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/10] | 23.10.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH08183814 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [DX] 1-15 * page 12 - page 13 * * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] *; | [A]US2005261449 (VOSKOBOYNIKOV ALEXANDER Z [RU], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5840644 | US5936053 | US6458982 | US6169051 | US5756608 | US5585509 | EP0670325 | US6479646 | US7276567 | JP3323347B | US2002002261 | US2001031834 | US2001053833 | WO2006097497 | US5153282 | WO9843983 | US5942459 | EP0570982 | EP0520732 | EP0495375 | EP0500944 | EP0277003 | EP0277004 | US5153157 | US5198401 | US5066741 | US5206197 | US5241025 | US5384299 | US5502124 | US5447895 | US2002058765 | EP0427697 | US5624878 | US5486632 | US5527929 | US5001205 | WO9633227 | WO9722639 | WO2004014998 | US5770753 | WO0202576 | EP1060198 | US6491816 | - SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, page 217 | - J. ORGANOMETALLIC CHEM., (1996), vol. 519, page 269 | - ORGANOMETALLICS, (2000), vol. 19, page 1262 | - CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING NEWS, (1985), vol. 63, no. 5, page 27 | - T.C. CHUNG ET AL., "Metallocene Catalysts and Borane Reagents in The Block/Graft Reactions of Polyolefins", POLYM. MATER. SCI. ENG., (1995), vol. 73, page 463, XP008122853 | - J. VLADIMIR OLIVEIRA; C. DARIVA; J. C. PINTO, IND. ENG, CHEM. RES., (2000), vol. 29, page 4627 | - E. Y.-X. CHEN; T.J. MARKS, "Cocatalysts for Metal-Catalyzed Olefin Polymerization: Activators, Activation Processes, and Structure-Activity Relationships", CHEM. REV., (2000), vol. 100, doi:doi:10.1021/cr980462j, pages 1391 - 1434, XP007920121 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr980462j | US19940285380 |