EP2157046 - Method of manufacturing MEMS devices providing a control of their cavity depth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM MEMS TECHNOLOGIES, INC 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tung, Ming-Hau 1712 48th Avenue San Francisco CA 94122 / US | 02 /
Kogut, Lior Alexander Yanai 46A 34816 Haifa / IL | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08153354.9 | 16.05.2007 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | US20060478702 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: US 478702 | [2010/08] | Previously filed application, date | WO2007US11812 | 16.05.2007 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2157046 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2157046 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B81B3/00, B81C1/00 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
B81B3/0072 (EP,KR,US);
B81C1/00047 (EP,KR,US);
B81B2201/042 (EP,KR,US);
B81C2201/0167 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2013/18] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von MEMS-Vorrichtungen mit einer Steuerung ihrer Kavitätstiefe | [2010/08] | English: | Method of manufacturing MEMS devices providing a control of their cavity depth | [2010/08] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de dispositifs mems fournissant un contrôle de la profondeur de leur cavité | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07794971.7 / EP1943185 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070794971) is 05.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2004209192 (LIN WEN-JIAN [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,13,17,18 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 11b-11d * [A] 8,14-16 [I] 3,20; | [X]US2004051929 (SAMPSELL JEFFREY BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,11,12,19 * paragraph [0042] * * figure 6b * |