EP1978098 - Use of multiple recombination sites with unique specificity in recombinational cloning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2016/47] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states INVITROGEN CORPORATION 1600 Faraday Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cheo, David 4307 Ambler Drive Kensington MD 20895 / US | 02 /
Brasch, Michael A. 20931 Sunnyacres Road Gaithersburg MD 20882 / US | 03 /
Temple, Gary F. 114 Ridge Road Washington Grove MD 20880 / US | 04 /
Hartley, James L. 7409 Hillside Drive Frederick MD 21702 / US | 05 /
Byrd, Devon R.N. 51 Cornwallis Drive Fredericksburg, VA 22405 / US | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
Cheo, David 4307 Ambler Drive Kensington MD 20895 / US | ||
02 /
Brasch, Michael A. 20931 Sunnyacres Road Gaithersburg MD 20882 / US | |||
03 /
Temple, Gary F. 114 Ridge Road Washington Grove MD 20880 / US | |||
04 /
Hartley, James L. 7409 Hillside Drive Frederick MD 21702 / US | |||
05 /
Byrd, Devon R.N. 9511 Briar Glenn Way Montgomery Village, MD 20886 / US | Representative(s) | Weber, Birgit Life Technologies GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 129 B 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Weber, Birgit Life Technologies GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 129 B 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2010/09] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2008/41] | Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08153538.7 | 11.12.2000 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | US20000188020P | 09.03.2000 Original published format: US 188020 P | US19990169983P | 10.12.1999 Original published format: US 169983 P | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1978098 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1978098 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/64, C12N15/10, C07K14/47, C12N9/00, C12N15/66 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
C12N15/10 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/64 (EP,US);
C12N15/66 (EP,US);
C12N9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | C12N15/64, C07K14/47, C12N15/66, C12N9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | Verwendung von mehrfachen Rekombinationsstellen mit einzigartiger Spezifizität beim Rekombinationsklonen | [2008/41] | English: | Use of multiple recombination sites with unique specificity in recombinational cloning | [2008/41] | French: | Utilisation de sites à recombinaison multiples avec une spécificité unique de clonage recombinatoire | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/18] | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00984184.2 / EP1250453 | Divisional application(s) | EP10151112.9 / EP2210948 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000984184) is 19.01.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.06.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9640724 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8-10,12-15,17 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,7,16; | [X]WO9921977 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-8,11-15,17 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1227147 (INVITROGEN CORP [US]) [E] 1-8,11-15,17 * the whole document *; | [X] - TSURUSHITA N ET AL, "Phage display vectors for in vivo recombination of immunoglobulin heavy and light chain genes to make large combinatorial libraries", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960612), vol. 172, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 59 - 63, XP004042709 [X] 1-8,10-15,17-26 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(96)00170-9 | [XY] - THORPE HELENA M ET AL, "In vitro site-specific integration of bacteriophage DNA catalyzed by a recombinase of the resolvase/invertase family", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, May 12, 1998, (19980512), vol. 95, no. 10, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5505 - 5510, XP002268753 [X] 1,4-6,11-15,17 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,7,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.10.5505 | [PX] - WALHOUT A J M ET AL, "GATEWAY RECOMBINATIONAL CLONING: APPLICATION TO THE CLONING OF LARGE NUMBERS OF OPEN READING FRAMES OR ORFEOMES", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (20000101), vol. 328, ISSN 0076-6879, pages 575 - 592, XP001056139 [PX] 1-8,10,12-15,17 * page 579 - page 582; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(00)28419-X | Examination | US5851808 | by applicant | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4736866 | US4800159 | EP0329822 | US4873191 | US4874748 | US4889818 | US4960707 | US4962022 | US4965188 | US4980286 | US5000333 | US5047342 | US5063155 | US5079352 | US5082784 | US5098839 | US5098837 | WO9206180 | WO9206188 | WO9206200 | US5139942 | US5143854 | US5147800 | US5149639 | WO9220316 | WO9222635 | US5179015 | US5192675 | US5200333 | US5202248 | WO9313663 | WO9314188 | US5231021 | US5244797 | US5248605 | US5252743 | WO9320221 | US5270179 | WO9407921 | US5304480 | WO9408598 | US5312746 | WO9412649 | US5328984 | US5334526 | US5334575 | US5374553 | WO9508548 | US5409818 | US5412087 | WO9516028 | US5436146 | US5436149 | US5436327 | US5445934 | US5455166 | US5464764 | US5470740 | EP0684315 | US5498523 | WO9610640 | US5512462 | WO9617053 | US5534428 | WO9640968 | WO9702358 | WO9702357 | US5599695 | WO9709451 | US5614365 | US5631153 | US5667973 | US5672491 | US5677170 | WO9743450 | US5712146 | WO9806736 | US5733743 | WO9820967 | US5763170 | US5766891 | US5770435 | WO9827203 | US5800992 | WO9847912 | US5837832 | US5843772 | US5851808 | US5858657 | WO9905574 | WO9905591 | US5871907 | US5888732 | US5888795 | US5889165 | WO9940105 | US5965796 | US5998205 | US6040435 | US6110372 | WO0052027 | US6120814 | US6143557 | US6270969 | US6277608 | US6451602 | US2003100110 | US6964861 | - LANDY, A., CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 3, pages 699 - 707 | - HOESS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 14, no. 6, page 2287 | - ABREMSKI ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, no. 1, page 391 | - CAMPBELL, J BACTERIOL., (1992), vol. 174, no. 23, page 7495 | - QIAN ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, no. 11, page 7794 | - ARAKI ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 225, no. 1, page 25 | - MAESER; KAHNMANN, MOL. GEN. GENET, (1991), vol. 230, pages 170 - 176 | - ESPOSITO ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES, (1997), vol. 25, no. 18, page 3605 | - ARGOS ET AL., EMBO J., (1986), vol. 5, pages 433 - 440 | - VOZIYANOV ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, no. 930 | - LANDY, A, CURRENT OPINIONS IN GENETICS AND DEVEL., (1993), vol. 3, pages 699 - 707 | - HOESS; ABREMSKI, Nucleic Acids and Molecular Biology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1990), vol. 4, pages 90 - 109 | - BROACH ET AL., CELL, (1982), vol. 29, pages 227 - 234 | - STELLWAGEN, A.E.; CRAIG, N.L., TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, (1998), vol. 23, pages 486 - 490 | - LUCKLOW ET AL., J. VIROL, (1993), vol. 67, pages 4566 - 4579 | - YORK ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 26, no. 8, pages 1927 - 1933 | - DEVINE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, pages 3765 - 3772 | - FRANCIA ET AL., J. BACTERIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 181, no. 21, pages 6844 - 6849 | - SAUER, B., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECH, (1994), vol. 5, pages 521 - 527 | - LANDY, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECH, (1993), vol. 3, pages 699 - 707 | - S. MOTTAGUI-TABAR, NAR, (1998), vol. 26, no. 11, page 2789 | - EGGERTSSON ET AL., MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEW, (1988), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 354 - 374 | - "Escherichia coli and Salmonella Cellular and Molecular Biology", ENGLEERG-KUKLA ET AL., Escherichia coli and Salmonella Cellular and Molecular Biology, ASM PRESS, (1996), pages 909 - 921 | - CAPONE ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1986), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 3059 - 3067 | - SEDIVY ET AL., CELL, (1987), vol. 50, pages 379 - 389 | - PHILLIPS-JONES ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 15, no. 12, pages 6593 - 6600 | - MARTIN ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (1993), vol. 21 | - TEMPLE ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 296, no. 5857, pages 537 - 40 | - ROBINSON ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 6, pages 137 - 143 | - FERGUSON, J. ET AL., GENE, (1981), vol. 16, page 191 | - HASHIMOTO-GOTOH, T. ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 41, page 125 | - SAUER, B., CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 521 - 527 | - LANDY, CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 3, pages 699 - 707 | - LIU, Q. ET AL., CURR. BIOL, (1998), vol. 8, pages 1300 - 1309 | - WILSON, G.G., NUCL. ACIDS RES, (1991), vol. 19, pages 2539 - 2566 | - LUNNEN, K.D. ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 74, pages 25 - 32 | - SAUER, B., CURRENT OPINIONS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 521 - 527 | - LANDY, A., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1989), vol. 58, pages 913 - 949 | - WATERHOUSE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, no. 9, pages 2265 - 2266 | - TSURUSHITA ET AL., GENE, (1996), vol. 172, no. 1, pages 59 - 63 | - PERSSON, INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 10, no. 2-3, pages 153 - 63 | - CHANOCK ET AL., INFECT AGENTS DIS, (19930602), vol. 3, pages 118 - 31 | - BURIONI ET AL., RES VIROL, (199703), vol. 148, no. 2, pages 161 - 4 | - LEUNG, THROMB. HAEMOST, (199507), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 373 - 6 | - SANDHU, CRIT. REV. BIOTECHNOL, (1992), vol. 12, no. 5-6, pages 437 - 62 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADVANCES IN APPLIED MATHEMATICS, (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - OURY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 22611 - 22614 | - MCNELLIS ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1996), vol. 8, pages 1491 - 1503 | - MAEMURA ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 31565 - 31570 | - KIM ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL, (2000), vol. 66, pages 788 - 793 | - STASSI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 7305 - 7309 | - MARTIN, APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL, (1998), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 1 - 15 | - KOMIYAMA ET AL., BIOL. PHARM. BULL, (1998), vol. 21, no. 10, pages 1013 - 1019 | - HANCOCK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 8856 - 8861 | - SAITO ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 203, no. 2, pages 241 - 250 | - FLORES ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, no. 14, pages 7815 - 7820 | - WOLD, F., POST-TRANSLATIONAL PROTEIN MODIFICATIONS: PERSPECTIVES AND PROSPECTS, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1983), pages 1 - 12 | - SEIFTER ET AL., "Analysis for Protein Modifications and Nonprotein Cofactors", METH. ENZYMOL, (1990), vol. 182, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(90)82049-8, pages 626 - 646, XP009082492 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(90)82049-8 | - RATTAN ET AL., "Protein Synthesis: Post-translational Modifications and Aging", ANN. NYACAD SCI, (1992), vol. 663, pages 48 - 62 | - SKRALY ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 64, pages 98 - 105 | - DENG ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL, (1999), vol. 65, pages 523 - 528 | - MADISON ET AL., MICROBIOL. MOLEC. BIOL, (1999), vol. 63, pages 21 - 53 | - "The Common Pathway to Lysine, Methionine and Threonine", G.N. COHEN, Amino Acids: Biosynthesis and Genetic Regulation, ADDISON-WELESLEY PUBLISHING CO., INC., (1983), pages 147 - 171 | - JARVIS ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL, (1998), vol. 9, pages 528 - 533 | - STANLEY, "glycosylation engineering", GLYCOBIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1093/glycob/2.2.99, pages 99 - 107, XP001018791 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/2.2.99 | - KHOLODENKO ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1997), vol. 59, pages 239 - 247 | - FU ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, pages 9321 - 9326 | - MCDANIEL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, pages 1546 - 1550 | - ROHR, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED ENGL, (1995), vol. 34, pages 881 - 888 | - PANKE ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 64, pages 748 - 751 | - MILLER, "Bacterial Detoxification of Hg(II) and Organomercurials", ESSAYS BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 34, pages 17 - 30 | - O'GARA ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL, (1997), vol. 63, no. 12, pages 4713 - 4720 | - CORBETT, "Phytochelatin Biosynthesis and Function in Heavy-Metal Detoxification", CURR. OPIN. PLANT BIOL., (2000), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 211 - 216, XP004793024 | - SCHNEPFETAL., MICROBIOL. MOLEC. BIOL. REV, (1998), vol. 62, pages 775 - 806 | - GOLDSPIEL ET AL., CLINICAL PHARMACY, (1993), vol. 12, pages 488 - 505 | - WU; WU, BIOTHERAPY, (1991), vol. 3, pages 87 - 95 | - TOLSTOSHEV, ARM. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL, (1993), vol. 32, pages 573 - 596 | - MULLIGAN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 926 - 932 | - MORGAN; ANDERSON, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 62, pages 191 - 217 | - MAY, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 155 - 215 | - WU; WU, J BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - KOLLER; SMITHIES, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 8932 - 8935 | - ZIJLSTRA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 435 - 438 | - MILLER ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1993), vol. 217, pages 581 - 599 | - BOESEN ET AL., BIOTHERAPY, (1994), vol. 6, pages 291 - 302 | - CLOWES ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 93, pages 644 - 651 | - KIEM ET AL., BLOOD, (1994), vol. 83, pages 1467 - 1473 | - SALMONS; GUNZBERG, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 129 - 141 | - GROSSMAN; WILSON, CURR. OPIN. IN GENETICS AND DEVEL, (1993), vol. 3, pages 110 - 114 | - KOZARSKY; WILSON, CURRENT OPINION IN GENETICS AND DEVELOPMENT, (1993), vol. 3, pages 499 - 503 | - BOUT ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 3 - 10 | - ROSENFELD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434 | - ROSENFELD ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, pages 143 - 155 | - MASTRANGELI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST, (1993), vol. 91, pages 225 - 234 | - WANG ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 775 - 783 | - WALSH ET AL., PROC. SOC. EXP. BIOL. MED, (1993), vol. 204, pages 289 - 300 | - WAGSTAFF ET AL., GENE THER, (1998), vol. 5, pages 1566 - 70 | - LOEFFLER; BEHR, METH. ENZYMOL, (1993), vol. 217, pages 599 - 618 | - COHEN ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL, (1993), vol. 217, pages 618 - 644 | - CLINE, PHARMAC. THER., (1985), vol. 29, pages 69 - 92 | - STEMPLE; ANDERSON, CELL, (1992), vol. 71, pages 973 - 985 | - RHEINWALD, METH. CELL BIO., (1980), vol. 21A, page 229 | - PITTELKOW; SCOTT, MAYO CLINIC PROC, (1986), vol. 61, page 771 | - PATERSON ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1994), vol. 40, pages 691 - 698 | - CARVER ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY (NY, (1993), vol. 11, pages 1263 - 1270 | - WRIGHT ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY (NY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 830 - 834 | - VAN DER PUTTEN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, pages 6148 - 6152 | - THOMPSON ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 56, pages 313 - 321 | - LO, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, pages 1803 - 1814 | - ULMER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, page 1745 | - LAVITRANO ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 57, pages 717 - 723 | - GORDON, "Transgenic Animals", INTL. REV. CYTOL, (1989), vol. 115, pages 171 - 229 | - CAMPELL ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 380, pages 64 - 66 | - WILMUT ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 385, pages 810 - 813 | - LASKO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6232 - 6236 | - GU ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 103 - 106 | - SAMBROOK, J. ET AL., Molecular Cloning, a Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), pages 16.30 - 16.55 | - WATSON, J.D. ET AL., Recombinant DNA, W.H. FREEMAN AND CO., (1992), pages 213 - 234 | - ASTATKE, M. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 278, pages 147 - 165 | - BARNES, W.M., GENE, (1992), vol. 112, pages 29 - 35 | - LAWYER, F.C. ET AL., PCR METH. APPL, (1993), vol. 2, pages 275 - 287 | - FLAMAN, J.-M ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES, (1994), vol. 22, no. 15, pages 3259 - 3260 | - SAIKI, R.K. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 487 - 491 | - KOTEWICZ, M.L. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES, (1988), vol. 16, page 265 | - GERARD, G.F. ET AL., FOCUS, (1992), vol. 14, no. 5, page 91 | - HOUTS, G.E. ET AL., J. VIROL, (1979), vol. 29, page 517 | - KOTEWICZ, M.L. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 265 | - SOLTIS, D.A.; SKALKA, A.M., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 3372 - 3376 | - ROGERS ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 266, pages 23 - 30 | - ALDRIAN-HERRADA ET AL., J. PEPT. SCI., (1998), vol. 4, pages 266 - 281 | - SYKES ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 17, pages 355 - 359 | - TAWFIK ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 652 - 656 | - ENCAMACION, CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 458 - 464 | - METTE ET AL., EMBO J, (2000), vol. 19, pages 5194 - 5201 | - CHUANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. (USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 4985 - 4990 | - ROSS; LANDY, CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 261 - 272 | - R. REED, CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEVEL., (1996), vol. 6, pages 215 - 220 | - S. MOUNT, NUCL. ACIDS. RES, (1982), vol. 10, pages 459 - 472 | - P. SHARP, CELL, (1994), vol. 77, pages 805 - 815 | - K. NELSON; M. GREEN, GENES AND DEVEL, (1988), vol. 23, pages 319 - 329 | - T. COOPER; W. MATTOX, AM. J HUM. GENET., (1997), vol. 61, pages 259 - 266 | - DERBYSHIRE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI, (1998), vol. 95, pages 1356 - 1357 | - PERLER, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 2, no. 7, pages 346 - 347 | - CHONG ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 192, pages 271 - 281 | US19950486139 | US19970065930 | US19980177387 | US19980108324 | US19990122392 | US19990122389 | US19990126049 | US19990136744 | US19990161403 | US20000517466 | US20000518188 | US20000695065 |