EP1980882 - Thin light bar and method of manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM MEMS Technologies, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Qualcomm Mems Technologies, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mienko, Marek 185 Estancia Drive, 316 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
Xu, Gang 10092 Amador Oak Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
Gruhlke, Russell Wayne 1820 View Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 04 /
Bita, Ion 65 Rio Robles East, Apt. 1204 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08153557.7 | 28.09.2007 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | US20060828511P | 06.10.2006 Original published format: US 828511 P | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1980882 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1980882 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
G02B26/001 (EP,US);
G02B6/00 (KR);
G02B6/0028 (EP,US);
G02B6/0038 (EP,US);
G02B6/0026 (EP,US);
G02B6/0031 (EP,US);
G02B6/0053 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2013/34] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dünner Leuchtstab und Herstellungsverfahren | [2008/42] | English: | Thin light bar and method of manufacturing | [2008/42] | French: | Barre de signalisation mince et son procédé de fabrication | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 22.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07839045.7 / EP1971884 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070839045) is 26.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2002135560 (AKAOKA HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * [Y] 1-11 [I] 3,5,7-9; | [XY]US2006051048 (GARDINER MARK E [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0614] , [0062] * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]JP2002098838 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2002365438 (MARK KK) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * |