EP1944222 - Vehicle backward movement assisting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuriya, Hisashi c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 02 /
Endo, Takashi c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Isao c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 04 /
Ando, Masahiko c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 05 /
Shimazaki, Kazunori c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
Kuriya, Hisashi c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | ||
02 /
Endo, Takashi c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | |||
03 /
Suzuki, Isao c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | |||
04 /
Ando, Masahiko c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | |||
05 /
Shimazaki, Kazunori c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08153804.3 | 11.05.2001 | [2008/29] | Priority number, date | JP20000140699 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000140699 | JP20000281467 | 18.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000281467 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1944222 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1944222 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/00, B62D15/02 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B62D15/0275 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/29] | B62D15/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Unterstützung einer Fahrzeugrückwärtsbewegung | [2008/29] | English: | Vehicle backward movement assisting apparatus | [2008/29] | French: | Appareil d'assistance de mouvement de recul pour véhicule | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 05.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 30.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01930082.1 / EP1199225 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010930082) is 05.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11334470 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AP]EP1022903 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [AP] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]GB2359796 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [E] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | JPH11334470 |