EP2106716 - Decorative portable object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Management Services AG Seevorstadt 6 2501 Biel / CH | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boularas, Maamar Rue des Buchilles 44a 2017 Boudry / CH | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2009/41] | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 08153894.4 | 01.04.2008 | [2009/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2106716 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A44C15/00, A44C17/02, A44C17/00, G04B47/04, G04B19/32, G04B45/00 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
A44C15/0015 (EP,US);
A44C17/00 (EP,US);
A44C17/02 (EP,US);
G04B19/32 (EP,US);
G04B47/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/24] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tragbarer Gegenstand zu Schmuckzwecken | [2009/41] | English: | Decorative portable object | [2009/41] | French: | Objet portable à effet décoratif | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 19.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1392604 (SMITH CHARLES G) [X] 1-3,5-7 * figure 4 * * page 2, lines 19-31 *; | [X]GB2136672 (YUNG TAK LAM PHILIP) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, lines 40-94 *; | [X]CH649697 (STETTLER HANS AG) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 68 *; | [X]EP0555753 (GENTA GERALD [MC]) [X] 1-3,6-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 9 *; | [X]US5669240 (LIMA ALEJANDRO E [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 50 *; | [X]CH688982 (TECHNOWATCH SA [CH]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 15 *; | [X]WO9859196 (LIMA ALEJANDRO E [US]) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 2, lines 4-6 * * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, line L *; | [X]DE20311000U (SEIDENBUSCH RICHARD [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE202004014894U (SEIDENBUSCH RICHARD [DE]) [X] 1-3* the whole document * |