EP2108383 - Medical devices with an anti-bacterial polyurethane urea coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08154208.6 | 08.04.2008 | [2009/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108383 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/34, A61L27/54, A61L29/08, A61L29/16, A61L31/10, A61L31/16 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
A61L29/085, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
A61L31/10, C08L75/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinische Geräte mit einer antibakteriellen Polyurethanharnstoffbeschichtung | [2009/42] | English: | Medical devices with an anti-bacterial polyurethane urea coating | [2009/42] | French: | Appareils médicaux dotés d'un revêtement de polyuréthane-urée antimicrobien | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/11] | 10.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO0143788 (BARD INC C R [US]) [DX] 1-5,7-11 * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 10, line 2 - line 17 * * page 16, line 2 - line 4 * * page 20, line 8 - page 21, line 2 * * page 27, line 8 - page 28, line 7 * * page 30, line 11 - page 31, line 3 * * claims 1-3,5,6,8,20-24,39 *; | [A]US2002192298 (BURRELL ROBERT EDWARD [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 2, paragraph 26 - paragraph 32 * * page 3, paragraphs 33,34 * * page 5, paragraphs 76,77 *; | [A]US2003198821 (TERRY RICHARD N [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 4, paragraph 68 * * page 5, paragraphs 74,75,82 * * page 6, paragraph 94 * * page 8, paragraph 113 ** claims 1-3,9,17-20 *; | [X]DE102006038940 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph 15 - paragraph 20 * * page 4, paragraphs 27,31 * * page 5, paragraphs 35,38 * * page 6, paragraphs 57,60 * * page 7, paragraphs 61,62 * * claims 1-4 * | by applicant | US3800087 | EP0433961 | DE4328999 | EP0711113 | WO0109229 | WO0137670 | WO0143788 | US2003147960 | WO2004017738 | WO2004024205 | US6716895 | US2004116551 | DE10351611 | US2006045899 | WO2006032497 | CN1760294 | DE102006017696 | - HARDES ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2007), vol. 28, pages 2869 - 2875 | - FURNO ET AL., JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, (2004), vol. 54, pages 1019 - 1024 | - MÜNSTEDT ET AL., ADVANCED ENGINEERING MATERIALS, (2000), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 380 - 386 | - C.-W. CHOU ET AL., POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, (2006), vol. 91, pages 1017 - 1024 | - Ullmanns Enzyklopädie der technischen Chemie, VERLAG CHEMIE, vol. 19, pages 31 - 38 |