EP1981003 - Lockbox key with restricted range wireless communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UTC Fire & Security Corporation 9 Farm Springs Road Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2012/03] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larson, Wayne F. 715 22nd Avenue NW Salem, OR 97304-3620 / US | 02 /
Kuenzi, Adam 1657 Sonya Drive SE Salem, OR 97301 / US | 03 /
Antrican, Jeff 305 Khartoum Street SE Salem, OR 97306 / US | 04 /
Briskey, Teri Lynne 39101 Military Road Monmouth, OR 97361 / US | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Chiva, Andrew Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/42] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08154226.8 | 09.04.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | US20070923395P | 12.04.2007 Original published format: US 923395 P | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1981003 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1981003 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, E05B19/00 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
E05B19/0005 (EP,US);
E05B67/00 (EP);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Title | German: | Lockbox-Schlüssel mit eingeschränktem drahtlosen Kommunikationsbereich | [2008/42] | English: | Lockbox key with restricted range wireless communication | [2008/42] | French: | Boîtier de sécurité pour clé avec un système de communication sans fil avec portée réduite | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8705069 (SUPRA PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - page 24, line 29 * * page 38, line 21 - line 33 * * page 54, line 10 - page 67, line 1 * * figures 1-20 *; | [X]US5815557 (LARSON WAYNE F [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - column 7, line 9 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2004219903 (DESPAIN JAY [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0037] ** figures 1-5n * | Examination | EP1501038 |