EP1980844 - Analysing the composition of the content of a container by measuring the complex dielectric properties at plural frequences selected from the range of several Hz to plural GHz and by measuring additionally the mass of the container with its content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/42] | Analysing the composition of the content of a container by measuring the complex dielectric properties at plural frequences selected from the range of several Hz to plural Ghz and by measuring additionally at least one further physical quantity like the mass of the container with its content | ||
[2013/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manneschi, M. Alessandro Via XXV Aprile 15 52100 Arezzo / IT | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manneschi, Alessandro 15, via XXV Aprile I-52100, AREZZO / IT | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2009/49] | Tetaz, Franck Claude Edouard, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2008/42] | Tetaz, Franck Claude Edouard, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08154254.0 | 09.04.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | FR20070054440 | 12.04.2007 Original published format: FR 0754440 | [2008/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1980844 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1980844 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N22/00, G01N27/02, G01N27/22 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
G01N27/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/26] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Analyse der Zusammensetzung eines Gefässinhalts durch Messen komplexer dielektrischer Eigenschaften bei mehreren Frequenzen im Bereich von einigen Hz bis mehreren GHz und durch Messen der Masse des Gefässes samt Inhalt | [2013/04] | English: | Analysing the composition of the content of a container by measuring the complex dielectric properties at plural frequences selected from the range of several Hz to plural GHz and by measuring additionally the mass of the container with its content | [2013/04] | French: | Analyse de la composition du contenu d'un récipient par mesure des caractéristiques diélectriques complexes à plusieurs fréquences échantillonnées sur la plage d'excitation de quelques Hz à plusieurs GHz et par mesure de la masse du récipient avec son contenu | [2013/04] |
Former [2008/42] | Analyse der Zusammensetzung eines Gefässinhalts durch Messen komplexer dielektrischer Eigenschaften bei mehreren Frequenzen im Bereich von einigen Hz bis mehreren GHz und durch Messen mindestens einer weiteren physikalischen Grösse wie z.B. der Masse des Gefässes samt Inhalt | ||
Former [2008/42] | Analysing the composition of the content of a container by measuring the complex dielectric properties at plural frequences selected from the range of several Hz to plural Ghz and by measuring additionally at least one further physical quantity like the mass of the container with its content | ||
Former [2008/42] | Analyse de la composition du contenu d'un récipient par mésure des caractéristiques diélectriques complexes à plusieurs fréquences échantillonnées sur la plage d'excitation de quelques Hz à plusieurs GHz et par mésure d'au moins une donnée physique additionnelle comme par exemple de la masse du récipient avec son contenu | Examination procedure | 21.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2012 | 29.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0014552 (MALCAM LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1712900 (MANNESCHI M ALESSANDRO [IT]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002050828 (SEWARD DEWITT C [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]GB1392708 (WIRA & MATHER) [A] 1-14 * page 3, column L; figure 1 *; | [A]US4485284 (PAKULIS IVARS E [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [Y] - KLOCK B A, "Usability assessment of a bottle content tester for use in airports by screeners", SECURITY TECHNOLOGY, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE 34TH ANNUAL 2000 INTERNATIONAL CARNAHAN CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 23-25, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20001023), ISBN 0-7803-5965-8, pages 174 - 177, XP010527860 [Y] 1-14 * page 174, column R * | Examination | US4319491 | US4403191 | - EBBE NYFORS AND PERTTI VAINIKAINEN, "INDUSTRIAL MICROWAVE SENSORS", INDUSTRIAL MICROWAVE SENSORS, XX, XX, (19890101), XP002334964 | - DUNCAN Q. M. CRAIG, "LOW FREQUENCY METHODS", Dielectric Analysis of Pharmaceutical Systems, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (19950101), pages 36 - 38, XP055045345 |