EP2000535 - Circovirus sequences associated with porcine wasting disease (PWD) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoetis W LLC 100 Campus Drive Florham Park NJ 07932 / US | [2013/28] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jestin, André 14, rue Jacques Cartier 22000 Saint Brieuc / FR | 02 /
Albina, Emmanuel 244 Draille du Plo Midi 34730 Prades-Le-Lez / FR | 03 /
Le Cann, Pierre 8 rue Louis Guilloux 56400 Auray / FR | 04 /
Blanchard, Philippe Résidence "Terre Marine" Appt 5021 2 rue de la petite colline 06250 Mougins Le Haut / FR | 05 /
Hutet, Evelyne 20 rue Kersaint 22190 Plerin / FR | 06 /
Arnaud, Claire La Morvannière 22510 Saint Trimoel / FR | 07 /
Truong, Catherine Apt 23 76 rue Saint Aubin 72000 Le Mans / FR | 08 /
Mahe, Dominique 22 rue Brandt 67720 Hoerdt / FR | 09 /
Cariolet, Roland 30, rue de l'Aubépine 22440 Ploufragan / FR | 10 /
Madec, François 91, rue de Valais 22000 Saint Brieuc / FR | [2014/04] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
Jestin, André 14, rue Jacques Cartier 22000 Saint Brieuc / FR | ||
02 /
Albina, Emmanuel 244 Draille du Plo Midi 34730 Prades-Le-Lez / FR | |||
03 /
Le Cann, Pierre 8 rue Louis Guilloux 56400 Auray / FR | |||
04 /
Blanchard, Philippe Résidence "Terre Marine" Appt 5021 2 rue de la petite colline 06250 Mougins Le Haut / FR | |||
05 /
Hutet, Evelyne 20 rue Kersaint 22190 Plerin / FR | |||
06 /
Arnaud, Claire La Morvannière 22510 Saint Trimoel / FR | |||
07 /
Truong, Catherine Apt 23 76 rue Saint Aubin 72000 Le Mans / FR | |||
08 /
Mahe, Dominique 22 rue Brandt 67720 Hoerdt / FR | |||
09 /
Cariolet, Roland 30, rue de l'Aubépine 22440 Ploufragan / FR | |||
10 /
Madec, François 91, rue de Valais 22000 Saint Brieuc / FR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/30] | Faivre Petit, Frédérique, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2009/49] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2008/50] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08154912.3 | 04.12.1998 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | FR19970015396 | 05.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9715396 | [2008/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2000535 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2000535 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/34, C12N15/86, C07K14/01, C12N7/04, C12N5/10, C12N7/00, A01K67/027, C12Q1/68, C07K16/08, G01N33/569 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K2039/525 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55 (US);
A61K2039/552 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/58 (US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/55 (EP,US);
C12N2710/14143 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10021 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10022 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10034 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10051 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10061 (EP,US);
G01N2333/01 (EP,US);
G01N2469/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/50] | Title | German: | Circovirus-Sequenzen im Zusammenhang mit PWMS (Post-weaning-Multi-systemic wasting-syndrom) | [2008/50] | English: | Circovirus sequences associated with porcine wasting disease (PWD) | [2008/50] | French: | Séquences de circovirus associé à la maladie de l'amaigrissement du porcelet (MAP) | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98958957.7 / EP1036180 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980958957) is 30.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 22.01.2014 | [2016/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9918214 (MERIAL SAS [FR], et al) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9929717 (UNIV SASKATCHEWAN [CA], et al) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [PY] - HAMEL, A.L. ET AL., "Nucleotide sequence of Porcine Circovirus associated with postweaning multisystemic wasting syndrome in pigs", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (199806), vol. 72, no. 6, pages 5262 - 5267, XP002078783 [PY] 1-14 * the whole document * | [PY] - MEEHAN B M ET AL, "Characterization of novel circovirus DNAs associated with wasting syndromes in pigs", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (199809), vol. 79, no. 9, pages 2171 - 2179, XP002090386 [PY] 1-14 * the whole document * | [PY] - MOROZOV I ET AL, "Detection of a novel strain of porcine circovirus in pigs with postweaning multisystemic wasting syndrome", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199809), vol. 36, no. 9, pages 2535 - 2541, XP002090921 [PY] 1-14 * the whole document * | [PA] - ALLAN G M ET AL, "ISOLATION OF PORCINE CIRCOVIRUS-LIKE VIRUSES FROM PIGS WITH A WASTING DISEASE IN THE USA AND EUROPE", JOURNAL OF VETERINARY DIAGNOSTIC INVESTIGATION, (199801), vol. 10, pages 3 - 10, XP002068503 [PA] 1-14 * the whole document * | [PA] - ELLIS J ET AL, "ISOLATION OF CIRCOVIRUS FROM LESIONS OF PIGS WITH POSTWEANING MULTISYSTEMIC WASTING SYNDROME", CANADIAN VETERINARY JOURNAL - REVUE VETERINAIRE CANADIENNE, (199801), vol. 39, pages 44 - 51, XP002068502 [PA] 1-14 * page 50, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [PA] - SEGALES J ET AL, "FIRST REPORT OF POST-WEANING MULTISYSTEMIC WASTING SYNDROME IN PIGS IN SPAIN", VETERINARY RECORD, (19971206), vol. 141, no. 23, page 600/601, XP002068504 [PA] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - TISCHER, I. ET AL., "Distribution of antibodies to porcine circovirus in swine populations of different breeding farms", ARCHIV4ES OF VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 140, no. 4, pages 737 - 743, XP002104704 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01309961 | [AD] - MEEHAN B M ET AL, "SEQUENCE OF PORCINE CIRCOVIRUS DNA: AFFINITIES WITH PLANT CIRCOVIRUSES", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY., READING GB, (199701), vol. 78, no. 1, pages 221 - 227, XP002068398 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * | [DA] - MANKERTZ, A. ET AL., "Mapping and characterization of the origin of DNA replication of porcine circovirus", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., ICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY US, (199703), vol. 71, no. 3, pages 2562 - 2566, XP002078782 [DA] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2006072065 | by applicant | FR2422956 | FR2464269 | FR2518755 | WO9011092 | WO9427238 | WO9511307 | - CNCM, (19970703), no. 1-1891 | - YOUNG, J.A.T. ET AL., SCIENCES, (1990), vol. 250, pages 1421 - 1423 | - KASAHARA, N. ET AL., SCIENCES, (1994), vol. 266, pages 1373 - 1376 | - COSSET, F.L. ET AL., J. OF VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 69, no. 10, pages 6314 - 6322 | - VALSESIA-WITTMAN, S. ET AL., J. OF VIROLOGY, (1996), vol. 70, no. 3, pages 2059 - 2064 | - TEARINA CHU, T. H. ET AL., J. OF VIROLOGY, (1997), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 720 - 725 | - INUMARU ET AL., IMMUNOL. CELL BIOL., (1995), vol. 73, no. 5, pages 474 - 476 | - ALLAN, G. M. ET AL., VET. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 44, pages 49 - 64 | - BARANY, F., PNAS. USA, (1911), vol. 88, pages 189 - 193 | - BOULTON, L.H. ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1997), vol. 78, no. 6, pages 1265 - 1270 | - BUCKHOLZ, R.G., "Yeast systems for the expression ofheterologous gene products", CURR. OP. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 538 - 542 | - BURG, J.L. ET AL., MOL. AND CELL. PROBES, (1996), vol. 10, pages 257 - 271 | - CHU, B.C.F. ET AL., NAR, (1986), vol. 14, pages 5591 - 5603 | - CHU, P.W.G. ET AL., VIRUS RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 27, pages 161 - 171 | - CLARK, E.G., AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OFSWINE PRACTITIONERS, (1997), pages 499 - 501 | - DAFT, B. ET AL., AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF VETERINARY LABORATORY DIAGNOSTICIAN, (1996), page 32 | - DERSE, D. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1995), vol. 69, no. 3, pages 1907 - 1912 | - DUCK, P. ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1990), vol. 9, pages 142 - 147 | - DULAC, G.C. ET AL., CAN. J. VET. RES., (1989), vol. 53, pages 431 - 433 | - EDWARDS, C.P.; ARUFFO, A., "Current applications of COS cell based transient expression systems", CURR. OP. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0958-1669(93)90077-A, pages 558 - 563, XP023601457 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0958-1669(93)90077-A | - EDWARDS, S. ET AL., VET. REC., (1994), vol. 134, pages 680 - 681 | - FELGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, page 7413 | - FONTES, E.P.B. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 11, pages 8459 - 8465 | - FRALEY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 255, page 10431 | - GUATELI, J.C. ET AL., PNAS. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878 | - HACKLAND, A.F. ET AL., ARCH. VIROL., (1994), vol. 139, pages 1 - 22 | - HANSON, S.F. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 211, pages 1 - 9 | - HARDING, J.C., AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OFSWINE PRACTITIONERS, (1997), page 503 | - HARDING, R.M. ET AL., JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 74, pages 323 - 328 | - HARDING, J.C.; CLARK, E.G., SWINE HEALTH AND PRODUCTION, (1997), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 201 - 203 | - HEYRAUD-NITSCHKE, F. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 23, no. 6 | - HOMER, G.W., SURVEILLANCE, (1991), vol. 18, no. 5, page 23 | - HOUBENWEYL, Meuthode der Organischen Chemie, THIEME, (1974), vol. 15-1, 15 | - HUYGEN, K. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1996), vol. 2, no. 8, pages 893 - 898 | - KANEDA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 243, page 375 | - KIEVITIS, T. ET AL., J. VIROL. METHODS, (1991), vol. 35, pages 273 - 286 | - KOHLER, G. ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, no. 5517, pages 495 - 497 | - KWOH, D.Y. ET AL., PNAS. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 1177 | - LADANY, S., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1989), vol. 27, pages 2778 - 2783 | - LAZAROWITZ, S. G. ET AL., THE EMBO JOURNAL, (1989), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 1023 - 1032 | - LUCKOW, V.A., "Baculovirus systems for the expression of human gene products", CURR. OP. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0958-1669(93)90078-B, pages 564 - 572, XP023601458 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0958-1669(93)90078-B | - MANKERTZ, A. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 2562 - 2566 | - MATTHEWS, J.A. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 169, pages 1 - 25 | - MCNEILLY, F. ET AL., VET. IMMUNOL. IMMUNOPATHOL., (1996), vol. 49, pages 295 - 306 | - MEEHAN, B.M. ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1997), vol. 78, pages 221 - 227 | - MERRIFIELD, R.D., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1966), vol. 88, no. 21, pages 5051 - 5052 | - MIDOUX, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 21, pages 871 - 878 | - MIELE, E.A. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 171, pages 281 - 295 | - NAYAR, G.P. ET AL., CAN. VET. J., (1997), vol. 38, no. 6, pages 385 - 386 | - OLINS, P.O.; LEE, S.C., "Recent advances in heterologous gene expression in E. coli", CURR. OP. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0958-1669(93)90071-4, pages 520 - 525, XP023601451 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0958-1669(93)90071-4 | - PAGANO ET AL., J. VIROL., (1967), vol. 1, page 891 | - SANCHEZ-PESCADOR, R., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 1934 - 1938 | - SEGEV D., Non-radioactive Labeling and Detection ofBiomolecules, C. SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, (1992), pages 197 - 205 | - SHIVER, J.W., Vaccines, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1995), pages 95 - 98 | - TASCON, R.E ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1996), vol. 2, no. 8, pages 888 - 892 | - TISCHER, I. ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 295, pages 64 - 66 | - TISCHER, I. ET AL., ARCH. VIROL., (1986), vol. 91, pages 271 - 276 | - TISCHER, I. ET AL., ZENTRALBL BAKTERIOL MIKROBIOL HYG, (1988), vol. 270, pages 280 - 287 | - TISCHER, I. ET AL., ARCH. VIROL., (1995), vol. 140, pages 737 - 743 | - URDEA, M.S., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1988), vol. 11, pages 4937 - 4957 | - WALKER, G.T. ET AL., NAR, (1992), vol. 20, pages 1691 - 1696 | - WALKER, G.T. ET AL., PNAS. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 392 - 396 | - WHITE, B.A. ET AL., Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (1997), vol. 67 | - ZHAO, T.M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ADAC. SCI., USA, (1996), vol. 93, no. 13, pages 6653 - 6658 |