EP2113376 - Ballistic-resistant articles comprising tapes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Aramid B.V. Westervoortsedijk 73 6827 AV Arnhem / NL | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winkler, Ernst Michael Verlengde Prümelaan 78 6824 JX Arnhem / NL | 02 /
Journée, Marinus Johannes Gerardus Binnenwei 28 6924 BM Loo / NL | 03 /
Peters, Martinus Wilhelmus Maria Gemma v. Nispenstraat 103 6521 KK Nijmegen / NL | 04 /
De Weijer, Anton Peter Driehuizerweg 338 6525 PN Nijmegen / NL | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Heimann, Anette CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Heimann, Anette CPW GmbH, Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 08155265.5 | 28.04.2008 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113376 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/10, D03D15/00, A41D31/00, F41H5/04 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
F41H5/0485 (EP);
D03D15/283 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B27/30 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/38 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/08 (EP);
B32B5/22 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
D03D1/0052 (EP);
D03D13/004 (EP);
D03D15/46 (EP);
A41D31/245 (EP);
B32B2260/021 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/02 (EP);
B32B2262/0223 (EP);
B32B2262/0246 (EP);
B32B2262/0253 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/06 (EP);
B32B2262/08 (EP);
B32B2262/10 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/103 (EP);
B32B2262/105 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2262/14 (EP);
B32B2307/50 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/56 (EP);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2571/02 (EP);
D10B2101/06 (EP);
D10B2101/08 (EP);
D10B2101/12 (EP);
D10B2101/20 (EP);
D10B2321/0211 (EP);
D10B2321/022 (EP);
D10B2321/06 (EP);
D10B2321/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/34] |
Former [2010/27] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schussfeste Artikel mit Bändern | [2009/45] | English: | Ballistic-resistant articles comprising tapes | [2009/45] | French: | Articles pare-balles comportant des bandes | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5578370 (FERRAR ANDREW N [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * example 1 * * column 5, lines 11-22 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 64 *; | [A]EP1403038 (LANKHORST INDUTECH BV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0036] *; | [DA]EP1627719 (FMS ENTPR MIGUN LTD [IL]) [DA] 1-10* paragraph [0004] *; | [X]US2007070164 (ELEAZER HOWELL B [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0014] , [0018] , [0020] , [0021] , [0025] *; | [A]EP1908586 (NOVAMEER BV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0013] * | by applicant | WO9112136 | EP0833742 | EP1354991 | EP1627719 | WO2006107197 | WO2008040506 | WO2008040510 |