EP2113508 - Novel triazole nucleoside derivatives, their preparation and their application in therapeutics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Medicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08155481.8 | 30.04.2008 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113508 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/056, A61K31/7056, A61P35/00 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
C07H19/056 (EP,US);
A61K31/7056 (EP,US);
A61K31/4196 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neuartige Triazol-Nukleosid-Derivate, ihre Herstellung und therapeutische Verwendung | [2009/45] | English: | Novel triazole nucleoside derivatives, their preparation and their application in therapeutics | [2009/45] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés de nucléoside triazole, leur préparation et leur application en thérapeutique | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/15] | 29.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006004795 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,11,20,22,45 *; | [E]WO2008067002 (SOUTHERN RES INST [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * pages 10-11, Compounds TA-28, TA-29, TA-32 * * page 15, Compound TA-18 * * claims 1,4,11-19 *; | [A] - MOYA J ET AL, "In vivo effect of EICAR (5-ethynyl-1-beta-D-ribofuranosylimidazole-ca rboxamide) on experimental infected rainbow trout (Oncorhynchus mykiss) and coho salmon (Oncorhynchus kisutch) fry with infectious pancreatic necrosis virus.", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH NOV 2000, (200011), vol. 48, no. 2, ISSN 0166-3542, pages 125 - 130, XP002524669 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-3542(00)00122-4 | [A] - CHUNG D H ET AL, "Synthesis of 1-beta-d-ribofuranosyl-3-ethynyl-[1,2,4]triazole and its in vitro and in vivo efficacy against Hantavirus", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, Online, vol. 79, no. 1, ISSN 0166-3542, (20080317), pages 19 - 27, (20080317), XP022654495 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Schema 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.antiviral.2008.02.003 | [A] - ZHU R ET AL, "Arylethynyltriazole acyclonucleosides inhibit hepatitis C virus replication", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, Online, vol. 18, no. 11, ISSN 0960-894X, (20080415), pages 3321 - 3327, (20080415), XP022711221 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Schema 1 * * page 3323; table 2 * * page 3324, column LEFT, lines 5-16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.04.026 | [A] - OETTLE HELMUT ET AL, "The role of gemcitabine alone and in combination in the treatment of pancreatic cancer", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, OXFORD, (20001101), vol. 11, no. 10, ISSN 0959-4973, pages 771 - 786, XP009099714 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00001813-200011000-00001 | [T] - WAN JINQIAO ET AL, "Discovery of Novel Arylethynyltriazole Ribonucleosides with Selective and Effective Antiviral and Antiproliferative Activity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (200902), vol. 52, no. 4, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1144 - 1155, XP002524670 [T] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * Schema 1 * * page 1147, column RIGHT, line 31 - page 1149, column RIGHT, line 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM800927R | by applicant | - WU Q. ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (2004), vol. 87, pages 811 - 819 | - WAN J. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2006), vol. 47, pages 6727 - 6731 | - ZHU R. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2007), vol. 48, pages 2389 - 2393 | - XIA Y. ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 5, pages 1695 - 701 | - LI W. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2008), vol. 49, pages 2804 - 2809 |