EP1990982 - Integrated communication apparatus comprising a Bluetooth headset [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sure Best Limited Offshore Chambers P.O.Box 217 Apia / WS | [2011/11] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states Lin, Pi-Fen 4F, No. 233, Sec. 4, Jhongsiao E. Rd. Taipei City 106 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Pi-Fen 4F, No. 233 Sec. 4 Jhongsiao E. Rd. Taipei City 106 / TW | [2012/29] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Lin, Pi-Fen 4F, No. 233 Sec. 4, Jhongsiao E. Rd. Taipei City 106 / TW | ||
Former [2008/46] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/46] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08155649.0 | 05.05.2008 | [2008/46] | Priority number, date | DE20072006639U | 09.05.2007 Original published format: DE 202007006639 U | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/46] | DE20072076639U | 09.05.2007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990982 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1990982 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60, H04M1/04 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
H04M1/2535 (EP);
H04M1/0258 (EP);
H04M1/04 (EP);
H04M1/6066 (EP);
H04M1/725 (EP);
H04M2250/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | Integrierte Kommunikationsvorrichtung mit Bluetooth Sprechgarnitur | [2008/46] | English: | Integrated communication apparatus comprising a Bluetooth headset | [2008/46] | French: | Appareil de communication intégré comprenant un casque Bluetooth | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2008 | AT | 18.07.2012 | BE | 18.07.2012 | CY | 18.07.2012 | CZ | 18.07.2012 | DK | 18.07.2012 | EE | 18.07.2012 | FI | 18.07.2012 | HR | 18.07.2012 | IT | 18.07.2012 | LT | 18.07.2012 | LV | 18.07.2012 | MC | 18.07.2012 | MT | 18.07.2012 | NL | 18.07.2012 | PL | 18.07.2012 | RO | 18.07.2012 | SE | 18.07.2012 | SI | 18.07.2012 | SK | 18.07.2012 | TR | 18.07.2012 | BG | 18.10.2012 | NO | 18.10.2012 | GR | 19.10.2012 | ES | 29.10.2012 | IS | 18.11.2012 | PT | 19.11.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005064813 (SEECODE CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 27 * * page 4, line 23 - page 7, line 24; figures 1-12 *; | [A]FR2884673 (PARROT SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** page 4, line 30 - page 8, line 19; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO2005064813 | FR2884673 |