EP1950402 - Fuel supply apparatus for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akita, Tatsuhiko c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Kurata, Naoki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Daichi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Mitsuto c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08155796.9 | 06.09.2005 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | JP20040295220 | 07.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004295220 | JP20040360046 | 13.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004360046 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1950402 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/38, F02M63/02, F02M53/04 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
F02M69/046 (EP,US);
F02D41/3094 (EP,US);
F02D41/3836 (EP,US);
F02D41/3845 (EP,US);
F02D41/3863 (EP,US);
F02D41/40 (EP,US);
F02M37/0052 (EP,US);
F02M53/04 (EP,US);
F02M63/0225 (EP,US);
F02M63/029 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0606 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0608 (EP,US);
F02D41/0255 (EP,US);
F02D41/086 (EP,US);
F02D41/3023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/31] | Title | German: | Brennstoffzufuhrvorrichtung für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [2008/31] | English: | Fuel supply apparatus for internal combustion engine | [2008/31] | French: | Appareil d'alimentation en carburant pour moteur à combustion interne | [2008/31] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 20.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/31] | 25.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05782407.0 / EP1802860 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002364409 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1024274 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10274076 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11351041 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2002364409 | EP1024274 |