EP1990183 - Device for carrying out creases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L.C.R. MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE S.R.L. Via del Lavoro 5 40050 Castello d'Argile, BO / IT | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorenzoni, Remo Via Circonvallazione Ovest, 44 40050 Castello d'Argile (BO) / IT | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Negrini, Elena Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6 40141 Bologna / IT | [2008/46] | Application number, filing date | 08155932.0 | 08.05.2008 | [2008/46] | Priority number, date | IT2007BO00348 | 10.05.2007 Original published format: IT BO20070348 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1990183 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1990183 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B31B1/25 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
B31B50/00 (EP);
B31B50/254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/15] |
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rillvorrichtung | [2008/46] | English: | Device for carrying out creases | [2008/46] | French: | Dispositif pour effectuer des plis | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 14.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE4006611 (GERHARDT JOERGEN [DK], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 42; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,6,10-14 [I] 8,9; | [Y]US3270628 (CLEM EVERETT W) [Y] 5,6 * figures 9,10 *; | [Y]DE520629 (PAUL KUNZE) [Y] 10-13 * page 2, line 122 - page 3, line 8; figures 3-5 *; | [Y]US5549539 (RAUTENBERG HORST [DE]) [Y] 10-13 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4936818 (HOLOHAN JR JOSEPH [US]) [Y] 10-13 * column 4, line 45 - line 47; figure 9 *; | [Y]US5123891 (NIERADKA ZIGMUNT [US], et al) [Y] 10-13 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4417883 (GRANGER ROBERT L [US], et al) [Y] 14 * column 3, line 8 - line 25; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]DE1299514 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER) [Y] 14 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 11; figures 1,2 * |