EP2119593 - Control device to control and/or regulate a vertical cut-off line for a vehicle's headlights [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Sergej Borlinghauser Str. 37 59557 Lippstadt / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Christian Am Richterbusch 21 b 33106 Paderborn / DE | 03 /
Pollert, Markus Fichtenstrasse 35 61476 Kronberg / DE | 04 /
Woltermann, Bernd Alderstrasse 21 70736 Fellbach / DE | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Downar, Michael Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 D-59552 Lippstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Downar, Michael Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 D-59552 Lippstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 08156152.4 | 14.05.2008 | [2009/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119593 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/14 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
B60Q1/1415 (EP);
B60Q1/1423 (EP);
B60Q2300/056 (EP);
B60Q2300/322 (EP);
B60Q2300/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | Steuergerät zum Steuern und/oder Regeln einer vertikalen Hell-Dunkel-Grenze von Hauptscheinwerfern eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2009/47] | English: | Control device to control and/or regulate a vertical cut-off line for a vehicle's headlights | [2009/47] | French: | Appareil de commande et/ou de contrôle d'une ligne de coupure verticale de phares d'un véhicule | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0761497 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * claims 1-4 * * figures 3-7,14,15,23a,23b *; | [Y]EP0869031 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 12 * * column 3, lines 5-11 * * column 4 - column 5, line 10 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1504960 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 3,4,7 * figure 2; claims 1-10 *; | [A]DE102005050841 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11-14* figure 1; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]DE102006043281 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * figures 1-9; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0008] , [0025] - [0030] *; | [A]US2008106886 (SUGIMOTO TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,8-14 * figures 1-7; claims 1,13,16 * | Examination | DE102005038581 | WO2008037388 | by applicant | DE102006043281 |