EP1993268 - Method, system and relay device for transmitting packet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
Li, Zhiqiang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgan District 518129, Shenzhen Guangdong / CN | 03 /
Liu, Shouwen Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgan District 518129, Shenzhen Guangdong / CN | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08156326.4 | 16.05.2008 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | CN20071107096 | 18.05.2007 Original published format: CN200710107096 | WO2008CN70720 | 16.04.2008 Original published format: PCT/CN2008/070720 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1993268 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1993268 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
H04L61/103 (EP,US);
H04L61/2596 (EP,US);
H04L61/5014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren, System und Relaisvorrichtung für Paketsendung | [2008/47] | English: | Method, system and relay device for transmitting packet | [2008/47] | French: | Procédé, système et dispositif relais pour paquet de transmission | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 05.01.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002007414 (INOUE ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 9,10 * * paragraphs [0090] - [0097] *; | [X]US6345051 (GUPTA DEV VRAT [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 1 * * column 10, line 7 - column 12, line 14 *; | [X]US2006098644 (PULLELA VENKATESHWAR R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1B,3A * * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] - [0043] - [0047] *; | [A] - JOSHI P KURAPATI M KAMATH INFOSYS TECHNOLOGIES LTD S DE CNODDER ALCATEL-LUCENT B, "Layer 2 Relay Agent; draft-joshi-dhc-layer2-relay-agent-00.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20070209), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015050050 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 15, paragraph 3 * |