EP2031885 - Method for porting and distributing numbers in IMS domains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Holding GmbH Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Lu Vodafone Holding GmbH Hans-Vilz-Weg 7B 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Wild, Peter Vodafone Holding GmbH Kaarster Weg 6 47807 Krefeld / DE | [2012/30] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
Yang, Lu Vodafone Holding GmbH Hans-Vilz-Weg 7B 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
Wild, Peter Vodafone Holding GmbH Kaarster Weg 6 47807 Krefeld / DE | Representative(s) | Weisse, Renate Bleibtreustraße 38 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Weisse, Renate Patentanwälte Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtreustrasse 38 10623 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | Weisse, Renate Bleibtreustrasse 38 10623 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08156459.3 | 19.05.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | EP20070108487 | 18.05.2007 Original published format: EP 07108487 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031885 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031885 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00, H04L29/06, // H04M3/42 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
H04L12/2818 (EP);
H04L12/2834 (EP);
H04M11/062 (EP);
H04Q3/0087 (EP);
H04W8/28 (EP);
G08C2201/93 (EP);
H04L12/2825 (EP);
H04L12/2836 (EP);
H04L2012/285 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Portierung und Vermittlung von Nummern in IMS-Domänen | [2009/10] | English: | Method for porting and distributing numbers in IMS domains | [2009/10] | French: | Procédé de portage et de transmission de numéros dans des domaines IMS | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2008 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | HR | 25.07.2012 | LT | 25.07.2012 | LV | 25.07.2012 | MC | 25.07.2012 | MT | 25.07.2012 | NL | 25.07.2012 | PL | 25.07.2012 | RO | 25.07.2012 | SE | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | NO | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 25.07.2012 | |
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 25.07.2012 | |
NO | 25.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1761077 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO2005053327 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 11 * * page 8, line 1 - page 11, line 21 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2004006534 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2004075507 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 6, line 24 - page 10, line 34 * * page 13, line 7 - page 19, line 22 * * page 26, line 4 - page 27, line 12 * * page 32, line 13 - page 55, line 17 * * figures 1-9 * | by applicant | DE19843451 | EP1761077 | WO2005053327 | WO2004006534 | WO2004075507 |