EP2123682 - Olefin polymerisation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS Manufacturing Belgium NV Scheldelaan 482 2040 Antwerpen / BE | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08156532.7 | 20.05.2008 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123682 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/00, C08F2/14, C08F10/00 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
B01J19/2435 (EP,US);
B01J19/245 (EP,US);
Y10S526/92 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/001 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F2/14 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Olefinpolymerisationsverfahren | [2009/48] | English: | Olefin polymerisation process | [2009/48] | French: | Procédé de polymérisation d'oléfine | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1083183 (FINA RESEARCH [BE]) [X] 1-3,5,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0024] , [0029] * * claims 1,9 * [Y] 6,7,9; | [X]WO2006044149 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0146] , [0148] * * figure 1 *; | [DY]EP1118625 (SOLVAY [BE]) [DY] 6,7,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0025] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1118625 | - Perry's Chemical Engineers' Handbook, MCGRAW-HILL, (1997), pages 19 - 24 |