EP1995320 - Polynucleotide markers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gielen, Johannes Jacobus Ludgerus 211C route de Vacquiers 31620 Bouloc / FR | 02 /
Kraft, Thomas Ejdervägen 1 K 227 33 Lund / SE | 03 /
Pin, Pierre Krutmijersgatan 8 b 217 41 Malmö / SE | [2009/16] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
Gielen, Johannes, Jacobus, Ludgerus 211C route de Vacquiers 31620 Bouloc / FR | ||
02 /
Kraft, Thomas Ejdervägen 1 K 227 33 Lund / SE | |||
03 /
Pin, Pierre Krutmijersgatan 8 b 217 41 Malmö / SE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08156812.3 | 23.05.2008 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | EP20070108777 | 23.05.2007 Original published format: EP 07108777 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1995320 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1995320 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/37] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polynukleotidmarker | [2008/48] | English: | Polynucleotide markers | [2008/48] | French: | Marqueurs de polynucléotides | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/53] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]WO2007122086 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007005305 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [SZ], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [XD] - GAAFAR R M ET AL, "Bacterial artificial chromosome-derived molecular markers for early bolting in sugar beet", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BREEDING RESEARCH, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BE, (20050401), vol. 110, no. 6, ISSN 1432-2242, pages 1027 - 1037, XP019321879 [XD] 1,2,4,5,8-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-005-1921-z | [X] - HOHMANN U ET AL, "A bacterial artificial chromosome (BAC) library of sugar beet and a physical map of the region encompassing the bolting gene B.", MGG MOLECULAR GENETICS AND GENOMICS, (200304), vol. 269, no. 1, ISSN 1617-4615, pages 126 - 136, XP002487656 [X] 1,2,4,5,8-14 * the whole document * | [X] - EL-MEZAWY A ET AL, "High-resolution mapping of the bolting gene B of sugar beet", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (200207), vol. 105, no. 1, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 100 - 105, XP002487538 [X] 1,2,4,5,8-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-001-0859-z | [DA] - ABE JUN ET AL, "A marker-assisted analysis of bolting tendency in sugar beet (Beta vulgaris L.)", EUPHYTICA, (1997), vol. 94, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 137 - 144, XP002487539 [DA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1002915623657 | by applicant | WO9001069 | - BATZER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5081 | - OHTSUKA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608 | - ROSSOLINI ET AL., MOL. CELL. PROBES, (1994), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADVANCES IN APPLIED MATHEMATICS, (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - W.R. PEARSON, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1990), vol. 183, pages 63 - 98 | - BARANY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (U.S.A., (1991), vol. 88, pages 189 - 193 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 1077 - 1080 | - NICKERSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (U.S.A., (1990), vol. 87, pages 8923 - 8927 | - GAAFAR R. M.; HOHMANN U.; JUNG C., "Bacterial artificial chromosome- derived molecular markers for early bolting in sugar beet", TAG THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (2005), vol. 110, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1007/s00122-005-1921-z, pages 1027 - 1037, XP019321879 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-005-1921-z | - MCGRATH J. M. ET AL., "Construction of a Sugar Beet BAC Library from a Hybrid with diverse Traits", PLANT MOL BIOL REP, (2004), vol. 22, pages 23 - 28 | - MÖHRING S.; SALAMINI F.; SCHNEIDER K., "Multiplexed, linkage group-specific SNP marker sets for rapid genetic mapping and fingerprinting of sugar beet (Beta vulgaris L.", MOLECULAR BREEDING, (2005), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 475 - 488 | - MULLIS ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1986), vol. 51, pages 263 - 273 | - ROSSO!!N! ET AL., MOL. CELL. PROBES, (1994), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98 | - WU ET AL., GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 560 - 569 |