EP2000985 - Device for automatically determining the format of a mail item [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES 113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fajour, Michel 38, rue des Pierrelais 92320 CHATILLON (FRANCE) / FR | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08156918.8 | 26.05.2008 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | FR20070055286 | 28.05.2007 Original published format: FR 0755286 | [2008/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2000985 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00685 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00701 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/34] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur automatischen Bestimmung des Formats eines Postartikels | [2008/50] | English: | Device for automatically determining the format of a mail item | [2008/50] | French: | Dispositif de determination automatique du format d'un article de courrier | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0819919 (NAGLER METALL TECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 40 *; | [A]DE9310395U (ROEHRIG SIGURD [DE]) [A] 4 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4328579 (MIEDERHOFF SABINE [DE]) [A] 4 * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [A]FR2370593 (VITAL ZOLTAN [BE]) [A] 6 * page 5, line 1 - line 34 * | by applicant | US7098410 |