EP2009546 - Method for executing a user interface application comprising a time-reversal sequence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irac, Olivier 14 Rue des Grandes Tanières 95320, ST LEU LA FORET / FR | 02 /
Pulrulczyk, Cédric 30 Rue de Louviers 27400 ACQUIGNY / FR | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/52] | Hervouet, Sylvie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/01] | Hervouet, Sylvie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil, 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08157138.2 | 29.05.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | FR20070056154 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0756154 | [2009/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009546 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F9/50, // H04L29/08 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
G06F16/957 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ausführung einer Benutzerschnittstellen-Anwendung, die eine zeitweilige Umkehrsequenz umfasst | [2009/01] | English: | Method for executing a user interface application comprising a time-reversal sequence | [2009/01] | French: | Procédé d'exécution d'une application d'interface utilisateur comprenant une séquence d'inversion temporaire | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 09.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6687745 (FRANCO LOUIS M [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 25 - column 6, line 58 * * column 7, line 43 - column 14, line 8 * * column 16, line 41 - column 21, line 31 * * column 25, line 28 - column 29, line 19 *; | [X]WO0203732 (MOBILETOP CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 7 * * page 10, line 1 - page 15, line 7 * * page 20, line 2 - page 22, line 4 *; | [X]US2006242626 (PHAM QUANG D [BG], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0019] - [0045]; figures 2,3,5,6 *; | [X]US7072932 (STAHL DAVID R [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 25 - column 7, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [A] - CARDONE R ET AL, "Using XForms to Simplify Web Programming", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WORLD WIDE WEB, WWW 2005, MAY 10-14, 2005, CHIBA, JAPAN, (20050510), pages 215 - 224, XP007902639 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] * | [A] - TANJA DE GROOT AND AL, "Dynamic User Profile and Service Management", ALCATEL-LUCENT. WHITE PAPERS, (200603), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.alcatel-lucent.com/wps/portal/, (20080211), XP002469247 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - PHAM BINH ET AL, "Handheld devices for applications using dynamic multimedia data", PROC. GRAPHITE INT. CONF. COMPUT. GRAPH. INTERACT. TECH. AUSTRALAS. S. EAST ASIA; PROCEEDINGS GRAPHITE 2004 - 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND INTERACTIVE TECHNIQUES IN AUSTRALASIA AND SOUTHEAST ASIA; PROCEEDINGS GRAPHITE 2004 -, (2004), pages 123 - 130, XP002468878 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] * | [A] - YING CAI ET AL, "Providing scalable on-demand video services for heterogeneous receivers", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2004. ICME '04. 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TAIPEI, TAIWAN JUNE 27-30, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040627), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-8603-5, pages 643 - 646, XP010770893 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [000I] - [00II] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2004.1394274 |