EP2009680 - Method of fabricating a polycrystalline silicon layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/01] | Method of fabricating a polycrystalline silicon layer, a TFT fabricated thereof, and an organic light emitting diode display device fabricated thereof | ||
[2014/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do, 446-711 / KR | ||
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Byoung-Keon c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Seo, Jin-Wook / c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Yang, Tae-Hoon c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee Kil-Won Mobile Display R&D center; IP Group Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Ki-Yong c/o Legal & IP Team Corporate Planning Staff Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/14] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
Park, Byoung-Keon c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Seo, Jin-Wook c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Yang, Tae-Hoon c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Lee Kil-Won Mobile Display R&D center; IP Group Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Lee, Ki-Yong c/o Legal & IP Team Corporate Planning Staff Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2009/01] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08157167.1 | 29.05.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | KR20070053314 | 31.05.2007 Original published format: KR 20070053314 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009680 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2009680 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L21/322, H01L21/02, H01L29/66, H01L29/786, H01L27/12 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
H01L21/02488 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02672 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/3221 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/3226 (KR);
H01L27/1214 (KR);
H01L27/1277 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66757 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66765 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/78618 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/01] | H01L21/20, H01L21/322 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/36] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Polykristallinsiliziumschicht | [2014/47] | English: | Method of fabricating a polycrystalline silicon layer | [2014/47] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une couche de silicone polycristallin | [2014/47] |
Former [2009/01] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Polykristallinsiliciumschicht, eines TFT, der damit hergestellt wurde, und einer organischen, lichtemittierende Diodenanzeigevorrichtung, die damit hergestellt wurde | ||
Former [2009/01] | Method of fabricating a polycrystalline silicon layer, a TFT fabricated thereof, and an organic light emitting diode display device fabricated thereof | ||
Former [2009/01] | Procédé de fabrication d'une couche de silicone polycristallin, TFT fabriqué selon ce procédé et affichage à diode électroluminescente organique doté de celle-ci | Examination procedure | 29.05.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 12.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 09.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2001041397 (FUKUSHIMA YASUMORI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-16 * the whole document * * figures 1A-1M * [Y] 6; | [X]US2003013279 (JANG JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0008] , [0056] - [0058] - [0065] *; | [Y]US2006033107 (LEE KEUN-SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 7,11 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0030] , [0036] *; | [Y]US2006263957 (WONG MAN [CN], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0044] - [0046]; claims 1,18,19 *; | [Y]US6380007 (KOYAMA JUN [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5-12 * column 11, line 13 - column 19 * * column 13, line 60 - line 61 * * claims 1,2 * | Examination | US6893503 | EP2003695 | US2002013114 | US2002074548 | - ISHIKAWA ET AL, "The Diffusion of Bismuth in Silicon", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (1989), vol. 28, no. 7, pages 1272 - 1273, XP009121147 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.28.1272 | - SCOTTEN W JONES, Chapter 1.6.6 Diffusivity of impurities in polysilicon, DIFFUSION IN SILICON,, PAGE(S) 33 - 35, (20061214), XP009150765 | by applicant | US2001041397 | US2003013279 | US2002013114 |