EP2000371 - Four point seat belt system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rouhana, Stephen 48170 Adams Ct. Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 02 /
Bedewi, Paul 20946 Cohasset Terrace Ashburn, VA 20147 / US | 03 /
Jaradi, Dean 54162 Myrica Drive Macomb, MI 48042 / US | 04 /
Carr, Kirsten 4957 High Meadow Lane Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US | 05 /
Sullivan, John 686 Wembley Court Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US | 06 /
Natalini-Whitmore, Tiffani 68145 Espada Road Cathedral City, CA 82234 / US | 07 /
Kankanala, Sunny 2198 Green Valley Court Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Adam Clive Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Messulam, Adam Clive Harrison IP 1st Floor, Box Tree House Northminster Business Park Northfield Lane, York YO26 6QU / GB | ||
Former [2008/50] | Messulam, Adam Clive A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 08157449.3 | 02.06.2008 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | US20070757762 | 04.06.2007 Original published format: US 757762 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2000371 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2000371 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2000371 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/02, B60R22/26 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
B60R22/26 (EP,US);
B60R22/02 (EP,US);
B60R2022/027 (EP,US);
B60R22/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2010/27] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vierpunkt-Sitzgurtsystem | [2008/50] | English: | Four point seat belt system | [2008/50] | French: | Système de ceinture de sécurité à quatre points | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 18.12.2013 | GB | 02.06.2014 | [2015/24] |
Former [2014/22] | SE | 18.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6139111 (PYWELL JAMES FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,12-14,16,19,20 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, lines 1-41 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 11 * * figures 1,3,4,5A * [Y] 5,10,11,15,17,18; | [XAY]US2004207246 (DELVENTHAL NEAL H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,12-14,19,20 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0053] * [A] 8-11,16-18 [Y] 5,15; | [AY]GB2386831 (LEAR CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,6,7,9,12-14,16,19 * page 2, lines 1-15 * * page 3, line 8 - page 11, line 6 * * page 13, line 27 - page 14, line 6 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 10,11,17,18; | [AY]DE10161289 (LEAR CORP SOUTHFIELD [US]) [A] 1-4,6,7,13,14,16,19 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] * * figures 1,2,7 * [Y] 5,15; | [A]US3620569 (MATHIS EARL) [A] 1-4,6,7,9,13,14,16,19,20 * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 16; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE8913309U (WIECHERT, SASCHA, 7500 KARLSRUHE, DE) [A] 1,2,4-6,13,14,16,19 * the whole document *; | [T] - S. MOSS ET AL, "Anthropometry for WorldSID A World-Harmonized Midsize Male Side Impact Crash Dummy", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, (20000619), URL: http://www.osti.gov/bridge/servlets/purl/770960-5JTO2t/native/770960.pdf, (20011114), XP002544514 [T] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2004207246 |