EP2014406 - Relocation device, contacting device, delivery system, relocation and contacting unit production facility and a transponder unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HID Global GmbH Am Klingenweg 6A 65396 Walluf / DE | [2009/34] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states HID Global GmbH An Klingenweg 6A 65396 Walluf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Ulrich Carl-Orff-Ring 129 87616, Marktoberdorf / DE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 08157620.9 | 27.10.2005 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | DE20041053388 | 02.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004053388 | DE20051028467 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028467 | [2009/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2014406 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2014406 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, B23K20/02, G06K19/077, H05K3/10 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
H01L24/78 (EP,US);
B23K20/005 (EP,US);
B23K20/106 (EP,US);
H05K13/06 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/78301 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85205 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01052 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01057 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01068 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19043 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49018 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/48 (US,EP);
H01L2924/01015, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/03] | B23K20/10, B23K20/00, G06K19/077, H05K3/10, H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Verlegevorrichtung, Kontaktiervorrichtung, Zustellsystem, Verlege- und Kontaktiereinheit Herstellungsanlage, Verfahren zur herstellung und eine Transpondereinheit | [2009/03] | English: | Relocation device, contacting device, delivery system, relocation and contacting unit production facility and a transponder unit | [2009/03] | French: | Dispositif de pose, dispositif d'établissement de contact, système d'avance, unité de pose et d'établissement de contact, installation de production et ensemble transpondeur | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05814349.6 / EP1807239 | Divisional application(s) | EP08170034.6 / EP2039460 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.01.2009 | 31.10.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4284466 (CHAYKA GEORGE A, et al); | [AD]WO9730418 (FINN DAVID [DE], et al); | [Y]US5931452 (NAKATOMI YOSHIHARU [JP], et al); | [XYI]DE19911683 (HIELSCHER GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP0880754 |