EP2008964 - Micro-oscillation element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/01] | Micro-oscillation element and array of micro-oscillation elements | ||
[2014/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuboi, Osamu FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Kouma, Norinao FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Soneda, Hiromitsu FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Okuda, Hisao FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Mizuno, Yoshihiro FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Matsumoto, Tsuyoshi FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Sawaki, Ippei FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/45] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
Tsuboi, Osamu FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Kouma, Norinao FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Soneda, Hiromitsu FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Okuda, Hisao FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Mizuno, Yoshihiro FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
06 /
Matsumoto, Tsuyoshi FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
07 /
Sawaki, Ippei FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Kaflerstrasse 15 81241 München / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2010/48] | Seeger Seeger Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Paosostrasse 95 81249 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/01] | Seeger, Wolfgang Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08158155.5 | 12.06.2008 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | JP20070173078 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007173078 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2008964 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2008964 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2008964 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B81B3/00, G02B26/08 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
B81B3/0078 (EP,US);
G02B26/08 (KR);
G02B26/0841 (EP,US);
B81B2201/033 (EP,US);
B81B2201/042 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0136 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/01] | B81B3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/18] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrooszillationselement | [2014/45] | English: | Micro-oscillation element | [2014/45] | French: | Élément à micro-oscillation | [2014/45] |
Former [2009/01] | Mikrooszillationselement und Anordnung von Mikrooszillationselementen | ||
Former [2009/01] | Micro-oscillation element and array of micro-oscillation elements | ||
Former [2009/01] | Élément à micro-oscillation et réseau d'élément à micro-oscillation | Examination procedure | 21.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 24.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1643290 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,12-14 * figures 2A-2D * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * [I] 8; | [X]US2006120425 (KOUMA NORINAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,11-14 * figures 1-5, 19, 30 ** paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0089] *; | [E]EP1975674 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14 * figures 1, 3, 8a, 14, 15, 25 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0074] * | by applicant | JP2003019700 | JP2004341364 | JP2006072252 |