EP2003699 - Semi-conductor element and method of producing a metal semi-conductor contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHOTT Solar AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2012/18] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states SCHOTT Solar GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 4 63755 Alzenau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wildpanner, Bernd Nürnberger Strasse 43 01187, Dresden / DE | 02 /
Von Campe, Dr., Hilmar Jakob-Lengfelder-Strasse 19 61352, Bad Homburg / DE | 03 /
Buss, Werner Burggartsweidig 7 63456, Hanau / DE | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [2014/46] |
Former [2008/51] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 08158162.1 | 12.06.2008 | [2008/51] | Priority number, date | DE20071027263 | 13.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007027263 | [2008/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003699 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2003699 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2003699 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (US);
Y10T428/12708 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Metall-Halbleiter-Kontakts | [2008/51] | English: | Semi-conductor element and method of producing a metal semi-conductor contact | [2008/51] | French: | Composant semi-conducteur et procédé de fabrication d'un contact entre un semi-conducteur et un métal | [2008/51] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 15.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12191953.4 / EP2568508 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2008 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | NL | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | SE | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | NO | 12.02.2015 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | AT | 12.06.2015 | GB | 12.06.2015 | IE | 12.06.2015 | LU | 12.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
AT | 12.06.2015 | ||
GB | 12.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
AT | 12.06.2015 | ||
GB | 12.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 12.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
IE | 12.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 12.11.2014 | |
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 12.11.2014 | |
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006132766 (FERRO CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-14,18,19 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0009] , [0027] * * paragraphs [0008] , [0023] - [0025] *; | [X]EP0729189 (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR [BE]) [X] 1,6,9-19 * column 10, lines 35-43; figure 3i * * column 8, lines 25-27 *; | [X]US4492812 (LINDMAYER JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,10 * column 2, lines 46-56 * * column 3, lines 34-48; claim 1 *; | [X]JPH05326990 (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4293451 (ROSS BERND) [Y] 1,6,11 * column 3, lines 33THERE,ARE,OTHER,FLICKR-51 *; | [Y]US4392010 (LINDMAYER JOSEPH) [Y] 1,6,11 * column 2, lines 47-63 *; | [A]GB2062351 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 12,14 * page 2, column 1, lines 45-65 *; | [A]WO0141221 (EBARA SOLAR INC [US]) [A] 16 * page 3, lines 3-15 *; | [A]DE2945450 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 15 * the whole document * | Examination | WO8302200 | US4336648 | GB1018848 | by applicant | US4492812 | WO2006132766 | EP0729189 | JPH05326990 | US4293451 | US4392010 |