EP2056007 - Flexible Pipe Comprising a Wound Tape of Composite Material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/19] | Flexible Pipe | ||
[2014/46] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Oil & Gas UK Limited 2 High Street Nailsea Bristol BS48 1BS / GB | [2015/11] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Wellstream International Limited Wellstream House Wincomblee Road, Walker Riverside Newcastle-Upon-Tyne Tyne and Wear NE6 3PF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sheldrake, Terence Wellstream International Limited Wellstream House Wincomblee Road Walker Riverside Newcastle-Upon-Tyne Tyne and Wear NE6 3PF / GB | [2015/16] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
Sheldrake, Terence Wellstream International Limited Wellstream House Wincomblee Road Walker Riverside Newcastle-Upon-Tyne Tyne and Wear NE6 3PF / GB | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Uno, Jennifer Elizabeth Hayes, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York, YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/31] | Uno, Jennifer Elizabeth Hayes, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York, YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/19] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08158632.3 | 19.06.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | GB20070012586 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: GB 0712586 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2056007 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2056007 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2056007 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/16, F16L11/08, // F16L11/12 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
F16L11/083 (EP,US);
B29C55/30 (US);
B29C70/521 (EP,US);
F16L11/12 (EP,US);
F16L11/16 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4987 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | F16L11/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/16] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Biegsames Rohr | [2009/19] | English: | Flexible Pipe Comprising a Wound Tape of Composite Material | [2014/46] | French: | Tuyau flexible | [2009/19] |
Former [2009/19] | Flexible Pipe | Examination procedure | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 26.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2013 | Observations by third parties | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.2016
Technip France 6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2016/35] |
Former [2016/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.2016
Technip France 6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Colombié, Damien Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Etienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | 23.02.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.07.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/36] | Appeal following opposition | 22.12.2017 | Appeal received No. T0094/18 | 20.03.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.07.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 15.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2008 | AT | 15.04.2015 | BE | 15.04.2015 | BG | 15.04.2015 | CY | 15.04.2015 | CZ | 15.04.2015 | EE | 15.04.2015 | FI | 15.04.2015 | HR | 15.04.2015 | IT | 15.04.2015 | LT | 15.04.2015 | LV | 15.04.2015 | MC | 15.04.2015 | MT | 15.04.2015 | PL | 15.04.2015 | RO | 15.04.2015 | SE | 15.04.2015 | SI | 15.04.2015 | SK | 15.04.2015 | TR | 15.04.2015 | IE | 19.06.2015 | LU | 19.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | GR | 16.07.2015 | IS | 15.08.2015 | PT | 17.08.2015 | NO | 30.06.2017 | DE | 03.01.2018 | [2018/21] |
Former [2018/20] | HU | 19.06.2008 | |
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
TR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 19.06.2008 | |
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
TR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 19.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 15.04.2015 | |
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 15.04.2015 | |
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0147288 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [X] 1,7,11,13-17 * page 5 - page 6; figure 3 * [I] 2,3,12; | [XI]FR2590646 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [X] 1,7,11,14-17 * page 8 - page 11; figure 5 * [I] 2,3,12,13; | [XI]EP0246360 (KANAO SHIRO) [X] 1,4,7,9-11,14,15,17 * column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 39; figures 6-15 * [I] 2,3,8,11-13,16; | [A]US2003183293 (FRASER DANA J [US]) [A] 5,6* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022]; figures 6-8 * | by applicant | EP0147288 | FR2590646 | EP0246360 | US2003183293 |