EP2025911 - Exhaust gas cooling device for a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühnel, Hans-Ulrich Kranichstr. 5 41239, Mönchengladbach / DE | 02 /
Hüsges, Hans-Jürgen Hörenweg 18 47877, Willich / DE | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | terpatent PartGmbB Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Patentanwälte ter Smitten Burgunder Strasse 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08158817.0 | 24.06.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | DE20071038882 | 17.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007038882 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025911 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025911 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
F02M26/30 (EP,US);
F02M26/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Abgaskühlvorrichtung für eine Verbrennungskraftmaschine | [2009/08] | English: | Exhaust gas cooling device for a combustion engine | [2009/08] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement de gaz d'échappement pour un moteur à combustion interne | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HR | 10.11.2010 | IE | 10.11.2010 | LT | 10.11.2010 | LV | 10.11.2010 | MT | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | NO | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | LU | 24.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/21] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0987427 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10355649 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 6* sentences 16-28, paragraph 30; figures 5,6 *; | [X]FR2891590 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102007002459 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * figure - * | by applicant | DE102004019554 | DE202006009464U | FR2891590 |