EP2138865 - Method and device for recording 3D images of a scene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IEE International Electronics & Engineering S.A.R.L. Zone Industrielle 6468 Echternach / LU | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2010/01] | Application number, filing date | 08159003.6 | 25.06.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138865 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G01S7/491 (EP,US);
G01S17/894 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Aufzeichnung von 3D-Bildern einer Szene | [2010/01] | English: | Method and device for recording 3D images of a scene | [2010/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'enregistrement d'images 3D d'une scène | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/21] | 23.01.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2256554 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [Y] 3-5,11-13 * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 16; figure 7 * * page 12, lines 1-4 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 6 *; | [AD]WO9615626 (LEICA AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-13 * pages 4,5 *; | [XY]US6115114 (BERG JOHNNY L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 5; figure 1 * * column 6, lines 11-14,20,21,30-35,53-55 * * column 7, lines 18-21,65-67; figures 2,3 * * column 8, line 67 - column 9, line 3 * * column 17, line 66 - column 18, line 8; figure 10 * [Y] 3-6,11-13; | [XY]WO0166030 (PHOTOGEN INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * page 7, lines 18-22,26-32; figure 2 * * page 5, lines 18-30 * * page 7, lines 1-5 * * page 11, lines 18-20 * * page 13, lines 7-11 * [Y] 3,6,11-13; | [XY]US6724467 (BILLMERS RICHARD I [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 6, lines 32-37; figure 2 * * column 3, lines 53-60 * * column 4, lines 14,15,24-26,45-50,55-57 * * column 5, lines 13-15 * * column 18, lines 3-8; figure 10 * [Y] 3-6,11-13; | [AD]US6825455 (SCHWARTE RUDOLF [DE]) [AD] 1-13* figure 4 *; | [AD]EP1659418 (IEE SARL [LU]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A] - DAVID M. POZAR, Microwave Engineering, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1998), XP007905845 [A] 1 * page 572; figure 10.21 * | by applicant | EP0792555 | US6825455 | EP1659418 | - SPIRIG ET AL., "The Lock-In CCD - Two-dimensional Synchronous Detection of Light", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, (1995), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.1109/3.406386, pages 1705 - 1708, XP000526180 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3.406386 |