EP2008847 - Roll-up blind with means for slowing the winding process and corresponding vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Comfort Systems France SAS - ACS France 5-7 rue du Moulin Jacquet Parc d'activité Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Advanced Comfort Systems France - ACS France 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet Parc d'activité Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | ||
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Wagon SAS 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet ZI N 2 79302 Bressuire Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chemineau, Nicolas 21 rue du Petit Moineau 85310, Chaille sous les Ormeaux / FR | 02 /
Neaux, Jean-Claude 8, chemin du Pas Bodin 79300, Terves / FR | 03 /
Thibeaudeau, Daniel 1 allée des Roses 79300, Terves / FR | 04 /
Dubouilh, Gilles 4 rue de la Gare 47400, Fauguerolles / FR | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Bioret, Ludovic Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue de Jouanet - B.P. 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Bioret, Ludovic Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue de Jouanet - B.P. 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08159133.1 | 26.06.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | FR20070056049 | 26.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0756049 | FR20070057548 | 13.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0757548 | [2009/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008847 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2008847 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/00 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
B60J7/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/36] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rollo mit Mitteln zur Verlangsamung der Aufwicklung und entsprechendes Beförderungsmittel | [2009/01] | English: | Roll-up blind with means for slowing the winding process and corresponding vehicle | [2009/01] | French: | Store à enrouleur à moyens de ralentissement de l'enroulement, et véhicule correspondant | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 29.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10163122 (BOS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 4 - column 8; figure - *; | [X]DE4320393 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3 - column 6; figure - *; | [X]DE202007005531U (ARVINMERITOR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]EP1112876 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3 - column 9; figure - *; | [X]DE102006004139 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3 - column 5; figure - *; | [A]DE102005048207 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]DE102006023813 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [PA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE202007005531U |