EP2141191 - Composite Package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amcor Flexibles Transpac N.V. Da Vincilaan 2 1935 Zaventem / BE | [2014/03] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Amcor Flexibles Transpac N.V. Da Vincilaan 2 1935 Zaventem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ettridge, Peter 7 Blanquettes Avenue Worcester Worcestershire WR3 8DA / GB | 02 /
White, Christopher R 24 Perrycroft Avenue Bishopsworth Bristol BS13 7RZ / GB | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Latham, Stuart Alexander, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Latham, Stuart Alexander, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Wardle, Callum Tarn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08159463.2 | 01.07.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141191 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2141191 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/00, B32B23/04, B32B23/08, B65D65/46, B29C47/02, B32B27/36, C08J7/04 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (US);
B29C48/022 (EP);
B29C48/15 (EP,US);
B29C48/155 (EP);
B29C48/21 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP);
B29K2995/006 (EP);
C08J2301/02 (EP,US);
C08J2467/00 (EP,US);
Y02W90/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24331 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | C08J7/04, B32B23/04, B32B23/08, B65D65/46, B29C47/02, B32B27/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Verbundstoffpackung | [2010/01] | English: | Composite Package | [2010/01] | French: | Emballage composite | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2008 | AT | 15.01.2014 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | HR | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | LU | 01.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/29] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 01.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 01.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 01.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 01.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 01.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 01.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 01.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0534471 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, lines 5-9 * * page 2, line 42 - page 6, line 42; figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO9711845 (CARGILL INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 27 * * page 8, line 22 - page 16, line 29 * * page 18, line 26 - page 23, line 31; figure -; claims 20-23 *; | [X]WO9737848 (UPM KYMMENE OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 5 - page 5, line 20; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9901278 (UPM KYMMENE OYJ [FI], et al) [X] 1-14* page 2, line 5 - page 6, line 28; figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO9904948 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 28 - page 10, line 4 * * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 21; figure -; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO02059199 (NOVAMONT SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph 2; claims 19-23 *; | [X]DE10104829 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] - [0015] - [0047] - [0079] - [0105]; claims 2-9 *; | [X]WO2005003209 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 3, line 14 - page 9, line 14 * * page 20, line 21 - page 26, line 2 * * page 28, line 23 - page 38, line 5 * * page 43, line 25 - page 49, line 32; example 142; claim - *; | [X]WO2006031568 (INT PAPER CO [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 8, paragraph 2; figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO2007092394 (INT PAPER CO [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0056]; claim - * | by applicant | WO02059199 | DE10104829 | WO2006001568 |