EP2020619 - Exposure apparatus and device manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2009/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawashima, Haruna c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
Saito, Nobuyuki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08159489.7 | 02.07.2008 | [2009/06] | Priority number, date | JP20070197852 | 30.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007197852 | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2020619 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
G03F7/70983 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70225 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70591 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70941 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2009/41] |
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Belichtungsgerät und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Vorrichtung | [2009/06] | English: | Exposure apparatus and device manufacturing method | [2009/06] | French: | Appareil d'exposition et procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif | [2009/06] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 05.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4870452 (TANIMOTO AKIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 2 ** column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 16 *; | [A]US5191200 (WERF JAN EVERT VAN DER [NL], et al) [A] 1,4,6,10 * figures 1,8,9a,13 * * column 16, lines 19-40 * * column 17, lines 6-21 * * column 18, lines 25-42 *; | [A]US2002005495 (KOHNO MICHIO [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0053] - [0056] - [0070] , [0071] *; | [A]US6496257 (TANIGUCHI TETSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,8,10 * abstract * * column 26, line 32 - column 28, line 52 * * column 30, line 47 - column 34, line 51 *; | [A]US2005030506 (SCHUSTER KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] - [0044] - [0046] - [0052] *; | [XA]EP1746464 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0042] - [0049] - [0055] - [0070] , [0098] - [0102] * [A] 4,6,8 | Examination | EP0689099 | by applicant | JPH11283903 | EP1746464 |