EP2022602 - Device for removing chips in machine tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCM Group S.p.A. Via Emilia 77 47900 Rimini / IT | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coltro, Davide Via G. Marconi 66 36010 Monticello Conte Otto (VI) / IT | 02 /
Meneghetti, Giovanni Via Linate 28 36030 Caldonio (VI) / IT | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41124 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2009/07] | Crugnola, Pietro Luppi & Associati S.r.l. Via Camperio, 11 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08159503.5 | 02.07.2008 | [2009/07] | Priority number, date | IT2007MO00245 | 25.07.2007 Original published format: IT MO20070245 | [2009/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022602 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2022602 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00, B02C18/06, A47L9/00 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
B23Q11/0046 (EP);
B02C18/06 (EP);
B02C18/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/07] | B23Q11/00, A47L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/42] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Spänen bei Werkzeugmaschinen | [2009/07] | English: | Device for removing chips in machine tools | [2009/07] | French: | Dispositif pour enlever des copeaux dans des machines-outils | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 12.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.04.2011 | FR | 01.08.2011 | [2012/24] |
Former [2012/22] | FR | 01.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE634784 (HALL MFG CO) [X] 1-7,14* figure 1 *; | [X]DE766255 (NEUFANG GUSTAV) [X] 1-7,14 * figure 3 *; | [X]GB861749 (TORNADO A G) [X] 1-7,14 * page 2, line 22 - line 29 *; | [X]DE2261297 (SCHROEDER MANFRED) [X] 1-7,14 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0795266 (ADLUS GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-8,14 * column 3, line 22 - line 30; figures 1,3 *; | [X]DE19720582 (STIHL MASCHF ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1-7,14 * column 3, line 14 - line 20; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE634784 | DE766255 | EP0795266 |