EP2020671 - Plasma display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Bumhee c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP GROUP Jinpyoung-dong Gumi-city 730-727 Gyoungsangbuk-do / KR | 02 /
Cho, Yoonlae c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP GROUP Jinpyoung-dong Gumi-city 730-727 Gyoungsangbuk-do / KR | 03 /
Hwang, Sangchul c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP GROUP Jinpyoung-dong Gumi-city 730-727 Gyoungsangbuk-do / KR | [2011/44] |
Former [2009/06] | 01 /
Park, Bumhee c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP GROUP Jinpyoung-dong Gumi-city 730-727 Gyoungsangbuk-do / KR | ||
02 /
Cho, Yoonlae c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP GROUP Jinpyoung-dong Gumi-city 730-727 Gyoungsangbuk-do / KR | |||
03 /
Hwang, Sangchul c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP GROUP Jinpyoung-dong Gumi-city 730-727 Gyoungsangbuk-do / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/06] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08159529.0 | 02.07.2008 | [2009/06] | Priority number, date | KR20070066540 | 03.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070066540 | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020671 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2020671 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2020671 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/49 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/42 (EP,KR,US);
H01J2211/26 (EP,US);
H01J2211/444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2011/44] |
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigetafel | [2009/06] | English: | Plasma display panel | [2009/06] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à plasma | [2009/06] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 10.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.07.2012 | FR | 31.07.2012 | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/21] | GB | 02.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1143670 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0081] *; | [A]KR20060088403 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5932968 (GHOSH ASISH [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * columns 1-7; figures 1,2,4,5 * |