EP2025498 - Method for decorating surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göring, Rainer Klosterdiek 46 46325 Borken / DE | 02 /
Wielpütz, Martin, Dr. Dombaumeister-Schneider-Str. 7 55128 Mainz / DE | 03 /
Baumann, Franz-Erich, Dr. Reitacker 17 48249 Dülmen / DE | 04 /
Kuhmann, Karl Peppermühl 7 b 48249 Dülmen / DE | 05 /
Monsheimer, Sylvia Tannenberger Weg 47 45721 Haltern am See / DE | [2009/08] | Application number, filing date | 08159575.3 | 03.07.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | DE20071038578 | 16.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007038578 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2025498 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2025498 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/16, B29C65/14, B44C1/10, B29C63/02 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
B29C65/1425 (EP,US);
B44C3/04 (KR);
B32B37/06 (US);
B29C65/1435 (EP,US);
B29C65/1654 (EP,US);
B29C65/7847 (EP,US);
B29C66/301 (EP,US);
B29C66/305 (EP,US);
B29C66/73365 (EP,US);
B29C66/81267 (EP,US);
B29C66/8362 (EP,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,KR,US);
B44C1/10 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0855 (EP,US);
B29C63/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/1412 (EP,US);
B29C65/1477 (EP,US);
B29C65/1483 (EP,US);
B29C65/1496 (EP,US);
B29C65/1606 (EP,US);
B29C65/1616 (EP,US);
B29C65/1619 (EP,US);
B29C65/1674 (EP,US);
B29C65/1696 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29C66/72141 (EP,US);
B29C66/72143 (EP,US);
B29C66/72321 (EP,US);
B29C66/72325 (EP,US);
B29C66/72327 (EP,US);
B29C66/72328 (EP,US);
B29C66/72329 (EP,US);
B29C66/73773 (EP,US);
B29C66/7392 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/7394 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,US);
B29C66/83441 (EP,US);
B29K2001/00 (EP,US);
B29K2001/12 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29K2021/003 (EP,US);
B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2025/00 (EP,US);
B29K2027/16 (EP,US);
B29K2033/12 (EP,US);
B29K2055/02 (EP,US);
B29K2059/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/006 (EP,US);
B29K2067/046 (EP,US);
B29K2069/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2083/00 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
B29K2909/08 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0026 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0027 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29C65/00 (US);
B29C66/71, B29K2001/08 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2009/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2009/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2019/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2021/003 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0625 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0633 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/065 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/16 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/08 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2055/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2059/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/003 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/006 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/046 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2075/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2081/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2083/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (US,EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Dekorierung von Oberflächen | [2009/08] | English: | Method for decorating surfaces | [2009/08] | French: | Procédé destiné à décorer des surfaces | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2001198982 (NISSHA PRINTING) [X] 1,6 * abstract * [Y] 2-5; | [XY]EP1477294 (CERA [FR]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0014] - [0022] * [Y] 2-5; | [YD]WO2005105412 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [YD] 2-5* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1715468 (DAICEL POLYMER LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] - [0022] * [Y] 2-5 | by applicant | US3055859 | DE1495730 | DE1300266 | DE2144528 | DE2152194 | DE2523991 | DE2712987 | US4163101 | DE3006961 | US4224419 | EP0038094 | EP0038582 | EP0039524 | EP0099532 | EP0113112 | EP0135130 | US4603166 | DE3728685 | EP0261748 | EP0302485 | EP0309095 | US4831108 | US5112685 | EP0568988 | US5436294 | US5447980 | WO9606881 | DE19542328 | EP0797511 | DE19632675 | DE19728629 | WO0020157 | EP1015214 | DE19916786 | US6136948 | WO0138061 | DE10026858 | WO0238677 | WO02055287 | - FACHMANN, Ullmanns Encyklopädie der Technischen Chemie, VERLAG CHEMIE, (1980), vol. 19, pages 39 - 54 | - Ullmanns Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VCH VERLAG, (1992), vol. A21, pages 179 - 206 | - STOECKHERT, Kunststofflexikon, HANSER VERLAG, (1992), pages 425 - 428 | - HRSG. R. KIRK; D. OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, WILEY, (1980), vol. 10 | - D. B. JACOBS, J. Zimmermann, Polymerization Processes, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1977), pages 424 - 467 | DE20031011438 |