EP2014838 - Wall bend fixture for water pipes leading through a wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Villeroy & Boch Gustavsberg AB 447 81 Vårgårda / SE | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rydetorp, Björn Finnatorp 6 447 95, Vårgårda / SE | 02 /
Nothall, Lars Postvägen 5 447 33, Vårgårda / SE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 08159650.4 | 03.07.2008 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | SE20070001614 | 03.07.2007 Original published format: SE 0701614 | [2012/49] |
Former [2009/03] | SE20070007614 | 03.07.2007 | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2014838 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2014838 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014838 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/02, F16L5/14 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
E03C1/021 (EP,SE);
F16L3/1226 (EP);
F16L5/06 (EP);
F16L5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Rohreinführungselement zum Einsetzen von Wasserleitungen durch eine Wand | [2009/03] | English: | Wall bend fixture for water pipes leading through a wall | [2009/03] | French: | Manchon pour l'introduction des tuyaux dans le mur | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2008 | AT | 03.04.2013 | BE | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | HR | 03.04.2013 | IT | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | NL | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | IE | 03.07.2013 | LU | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | ES | 14.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1679276 (SLINING HENRY W); | [X]US1725987 (SAMUEL KERSTEN); | [A]WO9211484 (DEPEX AB [SE]); | [A]JPH08144335 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [A]DE29614487U (HEWING GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | WO9106715 | WO0148326 | SE524719 |