EP2026360 - Material with PTC behaviour for medium- and high-temperature application, self-regulating structures comprising same and manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acome Société Coopérative de Production, Société Anonyme, à capital variable 14, rue de Marignan 75008 Paris / FR | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paul Bert, Philippe Le Feuil 50140 Romagny / FR | 02 /
Lagrève, Christian Le Val Michel 61100 La Chapelle Biche / FR | 03 /
Fermin, Christian La Basurais 50600 Chèvreville / FR | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08159728.8 | 04.07.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | FR20070005142 | 16.07.2007 Original published format: FR 0705142 | [2009/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026360 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2026360 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/02, C08L67/02 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
H01C7/027 (EP);
C08L67/02 (EP);
H01C7/028 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08L23/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Material mit PTC-Verhalten zur Anwendung bei mittleren und hohen Temperaturen, dieses umfassende selbstregulierende Strukturen und deren Herstellungsverfahren | [2009/08] | English: | Material with PTC behaviour for medium- and high-temperature application, self-regulating structures comprising same and manufacturing method | [2009/08] | French: | Matériau à comportement CTP pour application moyenne et haute température, structures autorégulantes le comprenant et leur procédé de fabrication | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 11.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | HR | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IE | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | MT | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | LU | 04.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 04.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 04.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 04.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0344734 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * example 4 *; | [A]EP0880302 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 11* column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP0965138 (ACOME SOC COOP TRAVAILLEURS [FR]) [DA] 1-13 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * | by applicant | EP0965138 |