EP2015202 - Method and apparatus for generating electronic content guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Sang-wook 7-307 Dongnam Villa, 197 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Hwang, Cheol-ju 109-1902 Taeyoung Desian Apt. Pungdeokcheon 2-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Yun, Won-dong 309-401 Buyeong 3-danji Apt. Donong-dong Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Soo-hong 101-1504 Haetae Apt. Gyeongan-dong Gwangju-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Min-ho 410-507 Jugong Apt. Byeolyang-dong Gwacheon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Jang, Jeong-rok (204) 72-86 Woncheon-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Choe, Yun-ju 210-1002 Jugong Apt. Woncheon-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Fearnside, Andrew Simon Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2009/44] | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08159928.4 | 08.07.2008 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | KR20070069216 | 10.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070069216 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015202 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G06F16/48 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erstellung eines elektronischen Inhaltsführers | [2009/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for generating electronic content guide | [2009/03] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour générer un guide de contenu électronique | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 27.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 14.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/28] | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/28] | Appeal following examination | 14.12.2011 | Appeal received No. T0659/12 | 24.02.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.05.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006060311 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0028] *; | [X]US2007143370 (BUSHMITCH DENNIS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0014]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0022]; figure 2 *; | [X]EP1622379 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0016] - [0019] *; | [A]US2006088276 (CHO WEI WEI A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] - [0015]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0029]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1355241 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] , [0037] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0054] , [0070] - [0072] * | by applicant | WO2006060311 |